This case was last updated from PACER on 07/31/2021 at 08:29:37 (UTC).

Davis v. Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada

Case Summary

On 06/01/2021 Davis filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kansas District. The Judges overseeing this case are Julie A. Robinson and Kenneth G. Gale. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-02252

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Kansas District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Julie A. Robinson

Referral Judge

Kenneth G. Gale

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Yulondia Davis

Defendant

Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kyle Henry Sciolaro

Attorney at BurnettDriskill

103 West 26Th Avenue, Suite 290

North Kansas City, MO 64116

Defendant Attorneys

Carrie E. Josserand

Attorney at Lathrop GPM, LLP - Overland Park

Corporate Woods, Building 82

10851 Mastin Blvd., SUIT 1000

Richard N. Bien

Attorney at Lathrop GPM, LLP - Kansas City

2345 Grand Boulevard

Kansas City, MO 64108-2618

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE: Parties shall file stipulation of dismissal by 9/10/2021. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 7/27/2021. (hw) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

#11

(#11) NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT by Yulondia Davis (Sciolaro, Kyle) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to Removal Complaint by Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. (Bien, Richard) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

#8

(#8) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Defendant Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. (Bien, Richard) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

#6

(#6) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court ( Response deadline 7/7/2021) by Defendant Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Bien, Richard) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

#4

(#4) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Bien, Richard) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

3 #3

Exhibit Workers Compensation Settlement

3 #2

Exhibit Social Security Notice of Award

3 #1

Exhibit Sun Life Benefit Information

#3

(#3) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Yulondia Davis (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sun Life Benefit Information, #2 Exhibit Social Security Notice of Award, #3 Exhibit Workers Compensation Settlement)(Sciolaro, Kyle) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. (Bien, Richard) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Wyandotte County District Court, case number 2021-CV-000109 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5501869.), filed by Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bien, Richard) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE: Parties shall file stipulation of dismissal by 9/10/2021. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 7/27/2021. (hw) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT by Yulondia Davis (Sciolaro, Kyle) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to Removal Complaint by Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. (Bien, Richard) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting as unopposed #8 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response re #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court. The response deadline is extended to 7/26/2021. Signed by Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson on 7/12/2021. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ams) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge REMOVED as to: #8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court . The motion will be resolved by the District Judge.(df) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Defendant Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. (Bien, Richard) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting, for good cause shown, #6 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Notice of Removal (state court petition) and #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court. Defendant's deadline to answer, respond, or otherwise plead to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended 14 days, or to and including Wednesday, July 14, 2021. Defendant's deadline to file a response to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand is extended 14 days, or to and including Monday, July 12, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 6/24/21. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court ( Response deadline 7/7/2021) by Defendant Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Bien, Richard) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting, for good cause shown and as unopposed, #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 state court petition/Notice of Removal. The deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise plead is extended to and including Wednesday, June 30, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale on 6/15/21. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (df) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada (referred to Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale) (Bien, Richard) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Yulondia Davis (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Sun Life Benefit Information, #2 Exhibit Social Security Notice of Award, #3 Exhibit Workers Compensation Settlement)(Sciolaro, Kyle) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Kenneth G. Gale for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (lb) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Defendant Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. (Bien, Richard) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Wyandotte County District Court, case number 2021-CV-000109 Trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $402, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-5501869.), filed by Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Bien, Richard) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Sun Life Assurance Company of Canada is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kyle Henry Sciolaro