This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/21/2020 at 08:26:37 (UTC).

Davis v. Stadion Money Management, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/23/2019 Davis filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Stadion Money Management, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nebraska District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Joseph F. Bataillon and Cheryl R. Zwart. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-00556

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph F. Bataillon

Referral Judge

Cheryl R. Zwart

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KIMBERLY DAVIS

Defendants

United of Omaha Life Insurance Company

STADION MONEY MANAGEMENT, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

F. Hill Allen, IV

Attorney at THAV, GROSS LAW FIRM

30150 Telegraph Road, Suite 444

Bingham Farms, MI 48025

Carl F. Engstrom

Attorney at NICHOLS, KASTER LAW FIRM

80 South 8Th Street, 4600 Ids Center

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Brock J. Specht

Attorney at NICHOLS, KASTER LAW FIRM

80 South 8Th Street, 4600 Ids Center

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Kai H. Richter

Attorney at NICHOLS, KASTER LAW FIRM

80 South 8Th Street, 4600 Ids Center

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Brandon T. McDonough

Attorney at NICHOLS, KASTER LAW FIRM

80 South 8Th Street, 4600 Ids Center

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Paul J. Lukas

Attorney at NICHOLS, KASTER LAW FIRM

80 South 8Th Street, 4600 Ids Center

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Grace Chanin

Attorney at NICHOLS, KASTER LAW FIRM

80 South 8Th Street, 4600 Ids Center

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher J. Boran

Attorney at MORGAN, LEWIS LAW FIRM - CHICAGO

77 West Wacker Drive

Chicago, IL 60601

Brent F. Powell

Attorney at WOMBLE, BOND LAW FIRM

One West Fourth Street

Winston-Salem, NC 27101

ABBEY M. GLENN

Attorney at MORGAN, LEWIS LAW FIRM

1111 Pennsylvania, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Jeremy P. Blumenfeld

Attorney at MORGAN, LEWIS LAW FIRM - PHILADELPHIA

1701 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

James J. Frost

Attorney at MCGRATH, NORTH LAW FIRM

1601 Dodge Street, Suite 3700, First National Tower

Omaha, NE 68102-1627

Mark F. Enenbach

Attorney at MCGRATH, NORTH LAW FIRM

1601 Dodge Street, Suite 3700, First National Tower

Omaha, NE 68102-1627

James O. Fleckner

Attorney at GOODWIN, PROCTOR LAW FIRM

100 Northern Avenue

Boston, MA 02210

Matthew L. Riffee

Attorney at GOODWIN, PROCTOR LAW FIRM

1900 N. Street, Nw

Washington, NC 20026

Jennifer K. Van Zant

Attorney at BROOKS LAW FIRM

3725 Blackhawk Road, Suite 200

Rock Island, IL 61201

Thomas J. Kenny

Attorney at KUTAK, ROCK LAW FIRM - OMAHA

1650 Farnam Street

Omaha, NE 68102-2186

Victoria H. Buter

Attorney at KUTAK, ROCK LAW FIRM - OMAHA

1650 Farnam Street

Omaha, NE 68102-2186

 

Court Documents

#102

#101

#100

#99

98 #1

Exhibit A - Certificate of Service

#98

97 #1

A - Certificate of Service

#97

#95

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

2 #1

United of Omaha

#2

#1

150 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#102) NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Thomas J. Kenny on behalf of Defendant Stadion Money Management, LLC (Kenny, Thomas) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#101) ATTORNEY LETTER by Clerk that Attorney Thomas J. Kenny has not paid the biennial assessment. If the requested action is not taken within fifteen (15) days of the date of this letter, this matter will be referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the entry of a show cause order. (CS) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#100) NOTICE of Appearance by Attorney Victoria H. Buter on behalf of Defendant Stadion Money Management, LLC (Buter, Victoria) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#99) ORDER - that the motions to withdraw filed by F. Hill Allen IV (Filing No. #97 ) and Carl F. Engstrom (Filing No. #98 ), as counsel of record for Plaintiff, are granted. F. Hill Allen IV and Carl F. Engstrom shall no longer receive electronic notice in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LKO) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#98) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Carl F. Engstrom by Attorney Brock J. Specht on behalf of Plaintiff Kimberly Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Service)(Specht, Brock) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#97) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney F. Hill Allen by Attorney Brock J. Specht on behalf of Plaintiff Kimberly Davis. (Attachments: #1 A - Certificate of Service)(Specht, Brock) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#96) ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the motion to withdraw filed by Brent F. Powell of Womble Bond Dickinson (US) LLP, as counsel of record for Defendant United of Omaha Life Insurance Company, (Filing No. #95 ), is granted. Brent F. Powell shall no longer receive electronic notice in this case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cheryl R. Zwart. (LAC) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#95) MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Brent F. Powell of Womble Bond Dickinson (US) LLP by Attorney James J. Frost on behalf of Defendant United of Omaha Life Insurance Company.(Frost, James) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#94) TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #91 for attorney Christopher J. Boran. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#93) TEXT ORDER granting Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice #90 for attorney Abbey M. Glenn. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (JLS) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
99 More Docket Entries
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (POWELL, BRENT) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.] (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney BRENT F. POWELL on behalf of Defendant UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY (POWELL, BRENT) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.] (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney CARL F. ENGSTROM on behalf of Plaintiff KIMBERLY DAVIS (ENGSTROM, CARL) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.] (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney PAUL JOSEPH LUKAS on behalf of Plaintiff KIMBERLY DAVIS (LUKAS, PAUL) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.] (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney KAI H. RICHTER on behalf of Plaintiff KIMBERLY DAVIS (RICHTER, KAI) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.] (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney BROCK J. SPECHT on behalf of Plaintiff KIMBERLY DAVIS (SPECHT, BROCK) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.] (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2019
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Mediation pursuant to Local Rule 83.9b of the Rules of Practice and Procedure of this Court. Please go to our website under Attorney Information for a list of mediators which must be served on all parties. (Coyne, Michelle) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.] (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to STADION MONEY MANAGEMENT, LLC, and UNITED OF OMAHA LIFE INSURANCE COMPANY. (Coyne, Michelle) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.] (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS and MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Coyne, Michelle) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.] (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2498817.), filed by KIMBERLY DAVIS.(ALLEN, F.) [Transferred from North Carolina Middle on 12/23/2019.] (Entered: 01/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United of Omaha Life Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas J. Kenny

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Abbey M. Glenn

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher J. Boran