This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/15/2021 at 17:40:07 (UTC).

Davis v. Spectrum Health & Human Services

Case Summary

On 01/05/2021 Davis filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Spectrum Health Human Services. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are John L. Sinatra, Jr. and H. Kenneth Schroeder Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00018

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John L. Sinatra, Jr.

Referral Judge

H. Kenneth Schroeder Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Felissa A. Davis

Niagara Falls, NY 14305

Defendant

Spectrum Health & Human Services

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Rosemary Enright

Attorney at Barclay Damon, LLP

200 Delaware Avenue, Suite 1200

Buffalo, NY 14202

Robert J. Thorpe

Attorney at Barclay Damon, LLP

125 East Jefferson Street

Syracuse, NY 13202

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) REPLY/RESPONSE to re #16 Objection to Report and Recommendations filed by Spectrum Health & Human Services. (Thorpe, Robert) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

#16

(#16) OBJECTION to #15 Report and Recommendations by Felissa A. Davis. (CGJ) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

#15

(#15) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Spectrum Health & Human Services. Objections due fourteen days from receipt. Signed by Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder Jr. on 5/13/2021. (KER)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP- by mailing copy to plaintiff (Entered: 05/13/2021)

#13

(#13) Summons Returned Unexecuted by Felissa A. Davis as to Spectrum Health & Human Services. (CGJ) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

#12

(#12) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Spectrum Health & Human Services re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Thorpe, Robert) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Thorpe on behalf of Spectrum Health & Human Services (Thorpe, Robert) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

10 #1

Memorandum in Support

#10

(#12) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Spectrum Health & Human Services re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Thorpe, Robert) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

#9

No Description Available

#8

No Description Available

#5

(#5) CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Felissa A. Davis; additional documents to support #1 Complaint. (CGJ) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Extension of Time to Seek an Attorney and Submit Additional information supporting case by Felissa Ann Davis. (CGJ) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

#3

(#3) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; that the Clerk of Court shall file Plaintiff's papers and cause the United States Marshal to serve copies of the summons, complaint and this order upon the named Defendant without Plaintiff's payment therefor, unpaid fees to be recoverable if this action terminates by monetary award in Plaintiff's favor; that Plaintiff must effect service within 90 days of the date the summons is issued, or request an extension of time for service, or the Court may dismiss this action; that Plaintiff must notify the Court in writing if her address changes, or the Court may dismiss the action. Signed by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. on 1/6/2021. (CGJ) Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff. (Entered: 01/07/2021)

#2

(#3) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; that the Clerk of Court shall file Plaintiff's papers and cause the United States Marshal to serve copies of the summons, complaint and this order upon the named Defendant without Plaintiff's payment therefor, unpaid fees to be recoverable if this action terminates by monetary award in Plaintiff's favor; that Plaintiff must effect service within 90 days of the date the summons is issued, or request an extension of time for service, or the Court may dismiss this action; that Plaintiff must notify the Court in writing if her address changes, or the Court may dismiss the action. Signed by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. on 1/6/2021. (CGJ) Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff. (Entered: 01/07/2021)

#1

(#5) CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Felissa A. Davis; additional documents to support #1 Complaint. (CGJ) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) REPLY/RESPONSE to re #16 Objection to Report and Recommendations filed by Spectrum Health & Human Services. (Thorpe, Robert) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) TEXT ORDER re #16 Objection to Report and Recommendations filed by Felissa A. Davis. Defendant's response is due by 6/2/2021. Plaintiff's reply, if any, is due by 6/9/2021. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. on 5/19/2021. (KEF) Chambers mailed a copy of this text order to Plaintiff on 5/19/2021. (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) OBJECTION to #15 Report and Recommendations by Felissa A. Davis. (CGJ) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk mailed a copy of #15 Report and Recommendations to Plaintiff (CGJ) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Spectrum Health & Human Services. Objections due fourteen days from receipt. Signed by Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder Jr. on 5/13/2021. (KER)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP- by mailing copy to plaintiff (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • DocketClerk mailed a copy of 14 Text Order to Plaintiff. (CGJ) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) TEXT ORDER re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Spectrum Health & Human Services : Response due by 5/7/2021; Reply due by 5/28/2021. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder Jr. on 4/1/2021. (KER)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP- by mailing copy to plaintiff (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Summons Returned Unexecuted by Felissa A. Davis as to Spectrum Health & Human Services. (CGJ) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Spectrum Health & Human Services re #10 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Thorpe, Robert) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert J. Thorpe on behalf of Spectrum Health & Human Services (Thorpe, Robert) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/26/2021
  • Docket(#7) TEXT REFERRAL ORDER (DISPOSITIVE) - Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder Jr., United States Magistrate Judge, is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. The Magistrate Judge shall also hear and report upon dispositive motions for the consideration of the District Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B) and (C). All motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. on 1/26/2021. Copy mailed to Plaintiff.(KLH) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of MANUAL FILING by Felissa Ann Davis; CD with Proof of Harassment, Videos and Voice Recordings of Termination. (CGJ) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Felissa A. Davis; additional documents to support #1 Complaint. (CGJ) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Extension of Time to Seek an Attorney and Submit Additional information supporting case by Felissa Ann Davis. (CGJ) (Entered: 01/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to Spectrum Health & Human Services. The Clerks Office has forwarded service packets to the US Marshal. (JLV) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; that the Clerk of Court shall file Plaintiff's papers and cause the United States Marshal to serve copies of the summons, complaint and this order upon the named Defendant without Plaintiff's payment therefor, unpaid fees to be recoverable if this action terminates by monetary award in Plaintiff's favor; that Plaintiff must effect service within 90 days of the date the summons is issued, or request an extension of time for service, or the Court may dismiss this action; that Plaintiff must notify the Court in writing if her address changes, or the Court may dismiss the action. Signed by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. on 1/6/2021. (CGJ) Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff. (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketAUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(CGJ) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketRemark: Plaintiff has been given a pro se packet including a privacy notice, consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge, Pro Se Assistance Program Information and ADR Notification. (CGJ) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Felissa A. Davis. (CGJ) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Spectrum Health & Human Services, filed by Felissa A. Davis. (CGJ) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert J. Thorpe(Designation Retained)