This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 06:37:03 (UTC).

DAVIS v. SIX FLAGS ENTERTAINMENT CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 DAVIS filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SIX FLAGS ENTERTAINMENT CORPORATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is ANITA B. BRODY. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-05735

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ANITA B. BRODY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LESTER DAVIS

Defendants

SIX FLAGS ENTERTAINMENT CORPORATION

SIX FLAGS ENTERTAINMENT CORPORATION doing business as SIX FLAGS GREAT ADVENTURE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARK S. KARDOS

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF KARDOS & GOCH

1515 Market St., Suite 1510

Philadelphia, PA 19102

Defendant Attorney

HEATHER M. EICHENBAUM

Attorney at SPECTOR GADON & ROSEN PC

1635 Market Street, 7Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) STIPULATION of Dismissal Of Complaint Without Prejudice by SIX FLAGS ENTERTAINMENT CORPORATION. (EICHENBAUM, HEATHER) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Hearing:A RULE 16 CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 5/11/2020 AT 10:30 AM IN JUDGE'S CHAMBERS, ROOM 7613, 7TH FL, 601 MARKET ST., PHILADELPHIA, PA BEFORE HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY.(jwl, ) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

#12

(#12) ORDER denying #9 MOTION TO STRIKE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 3/5/20.3/5/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jwl, ) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

9 #9

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

9 #8

Declaration Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement

9 #7

Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order(s)

9 #6

Certificate of Service Certificate of Service

9 #5

Exhibit Exhibit D

9 #4

Exhibit Exhibit C

9 #3

Exhibit Exhibit B

9 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A

9 #1

Memorandum Memorandum of Law in Support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion

#9

(#9) RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant and Cross-Motion to Strike the Entry of Default and Default Judgment or, in the Alternative, to Set Aside the Entry of Default filed by SIX FLAGS ENTERTAINMENT CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law in Support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion For Entry of Default Judgment and Cross-Motion to Vacate or Strike Default of Defendant, Six Flags Entertainment Corporation, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service, #7 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order(s), #8 Declaration Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, #9 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(EICHENBAUM, HEATHER) Modified on 3/4/2020 (tjd). (Entered: 02/28/2020)

8 #5

Exhibit

8 #4

Exhibit

8 #3

Exhibit

8 #2

Certificate of Service

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION of Dismissal Of Complaint Without Prejudice by SIX FLAGS ENTERTAINMENT CORPORATION. (EICHENBAUM, HEATHER) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Hearing:A RULE 16 CONFERENCE IS SET FOR 5/11/2020 AT 10:30 AM IN JUDGE'S CHAMBERS, ROOM 7613, 7TH FL, 601 MARKET ST., PHILADELPHIA, PA BEFORE HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY.(jwl, ) (Entered: 03/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER denying #9 MOTION TO STRIKE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 3/5/20.3/5/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jwl, ) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER withdrawing #8 MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT; granting #10 MOTION FOR ORDER. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 3/5/20.3/5/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jwl, ) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Proposed Consent Order filed by SIX FLAGS ENTERTAINMENT CORPORATION.(EICHENBAUM, HEATHER) Modified on 3/9/2020 (tjd). (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant and Cross-Motion to Strike the Entry of Default and Default Judgment or, in the Alternative, to Set Aside the Entry of Default filed by SIX FLAGS ENTERTAINMENT CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Law in Support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion For Entry of Default Judgment and Cross-Motion to Vacate or Strike Default of Defendant, Six Flags Entertainment Corporation, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D, #6 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service, #7 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order(s), #8 Declaration Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, #9 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(EICHENBAUM, HEATHER) Modified on 3/4/2020 (tjd). (Entered: 02/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Default Judgment against Defendant filed by LESTER DAVIS.Memorandum, Motion. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(KARDOS, MARK) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER denying #6 MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT. SIGNED BY HONORABLE ANITA B. BRODY ON 02/11/20.02/11/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jwl, ) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Entry of Default filed by LESTER DAVIS.Entry of Default Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KARDOS, MARK) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Letter instructing plaintiff's counsel to file for default judgment on or before February 24, 2020, dated 2/11/20 (jwl, ) (Main Document 5 replaced on 2/11/2020) (jwl, ). (Main Document 5 replaced on 2/11/2020) (jwl, ). (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketDefault Entered (nd, ) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • DocketDEFAULT BY SIX FLAGS ENTERTAINMENT CORPORATION FOR FAILURE TO APPEAR, PLEAD OR OTHERWISE DEFEND. (nd, ) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by LESTER DAVIS (KARDOS, MARK) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Default LESTER DAVIS against SIX FLAGS ENTERTAINMENT CORPORATION. (KARDOS, MARK) Modified on 1/9/2020 (nd, ). (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Returned Executed by Mark Kardos re: served Civil Complaint on 12/14/2019 by Certified Mail, answer due 1/4/2020. (KARDOS, MARK) Modified on 12/18/2019 (tjd). (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • Docket1 Original Summons Issued as to SIX FLAGS ENTERTAINMENT CORPORATION forwarded to Plaintiff's Counsel on 12/5/19.(rf, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against SIX FLAGS ENTERTAINMENT CORPORATION ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number PPE207832.), filed by LESTER DAVIS. (Attachments: #1 Designation Form, #2 Case Management Track Form)(rf, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.