This case was last updated from PACER on 03/02/2020 at 10:22:46 (UTC).

Davis v. RCO Limited

Case Summary

On 01/02/2020 Davis filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against RCO Limited. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael H. Watson and Elizabeth Preston Deavers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00033

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael H. Watson

Referral Judge

Elizabeth Preston Deavers

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tenile Davis

Defendant

RCO Limited

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Theodore C Copetas

Attorney at Eberly McMahon Copetas LLC

2321 Kemper Lane, Suite 100

Cincinnati, OH 45206

Defendant Attorneys

Karen T Dunlevey

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C.

8534 Yankee Street, Suite E

Dayton, OH 45458

Mark B Gerano

Attorney at Jackson Lewis P.C.

201 E. Fifth Street, 26Th Floor

Cincinnati, OH 45202

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff Tenile Davis. (Copetas, Theodore) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 2/25/2020 11:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark B Gerano for Defendant RCO Limited (Gerano, Mark) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant RCO Limited. (Dunlevey, Karen) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by RCO Limited. (Dunlevey, Karen) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant RCO Limited. RCO Limited served on 1/7/2020, answer due 1/28/2020. (bjc) Modified service and answer dates on 1/13/2020 (ew). (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#5

(#5) Clerk's CERTIFICATE of Mailing re: #1 Complaint and #2 and #3 Summons Issued. (cb) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 82.1, this case is hereby transferred from the docket of the Honorable Michael R. Barrett to the Office of the Clerk for reassignment to the Eastern Division of the Southern District of Ohio at Columbus. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 1/3/2020. (jlw) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to RCO Limited. (cb) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to RCO Limited. (cb) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

1 #3

Summons Form

1 #2

Summons Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against RCO Limited ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7262721), filed by Tenile Davis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form, #3 Summons Form) (Copetas, Theodore) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE: The PPTC set for 2/25/2020 at 11:30 AM is VACATED. (See ECF No. #11 .) (sln) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff Tenile Davis. (Copetas, Theodore) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 2/25/2020 11:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark B Gerano for Defendant RCO Limited (Gerano, Mark) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant RCO Limited. (Dunlevey, Karen) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by RCO Limited. (Dunlevey, Karen) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • DocketReset Deadlines: Answer due 1/28/2020. (ew) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant RCO Limited. RCO Limited served on 1/7/2020, answer due 1/28/2020. (bjc) Modified service and answer dates on 1/13/2020 (ew). (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Clerk's CERTIFICATE of Mailing re: #1 Complaint and #2 and #3 Summons Issued. (cb) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketCase transferred in from Cincinnati Division on 01/03/2020 Case Number 1:20-cv-2. Case assigned to Judge Michael H. Watson and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers.. (jlw) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 82.1, this case is hereby transferred from the docket of the Honorable Michael R. Barrett to the Office of the Clerk for reassignment to the Eastern Division of the Southern District of Ohio at Columbus. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 1/3/2020. (jlw) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to RCO Limited. (cb) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to RCO Limited. (cb) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • DocketIf this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Stephanie K. Bowman. (cb) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against RCO Limited ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7262721), filed by Tenile Davis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form, #3 Summons Form) (Copetas, Theodore) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RCO Limited is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Theodore C Copetas