This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/11/2023 at 09:26:58 (UTC).

Davis v. Radius Global Solutions, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/10/2023 Davis filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Radius Global Solutions, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:23-CV-60044

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Erik Davis

Defendant

Radius Global Solutions, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Joel David Lucoff

Suite 415, 3440 Hollywood Blvd

Hollywood, FL 33021

Defendant Attorneys

Dayle Marie Van Hoose

Attorney at Sessions, Israel & Shartle, LLC

3350 Buschwood Park Drive, Suite 195

Tampa, FL 33618

Rachel Megan Fleishman

Attorney at Sessions, Israel and Shartle, LLC

3350 Buschwood Park Drive, Suite 195

Tampa, FL 33618

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Summon(s)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to RADIUS GLOBAL SOLUTIONS, LLC. (rbe) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Filing of Exhibit B by Erik Davis re #1 Complaint (Lucoff, Joel) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Erik Davis. RADIUS GLOBAL SOLUTIONS, LLC., served on 1/20/2023, response/answer due 2/10/2023. (Lucoff, Joel) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Erik Davis (Lucoff, Joel) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by Erik Davis (Lucoff, Joel) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

#8

(#8) ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report, Certificates of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statements due by 2/17/2023. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 1/23/2023. See attached document for full details. (jas) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

#9

(#9) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Erik Davis (Lucoff, Joel) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dayle Marie Van Hoose on behalf of Radius Global Solutions, LLC. Attorney Dayle Marie Van Hoose added to party Radius Global Solutions, LLC(pty:dft). (Van Hoose, Dayle) (Entered: 02/10/2023)

#11

(#11) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Radius Global Solutions, LLC. Attorney Rachel Megan Fleishman added to party Radius Global Solutions, LLC(pty:dft). (Fleishman, Rachel) (Entered: 02/10/2023)

#12

(#12) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Radius Global Solutions, LLC identifying Corporate Parent NGI Acquisition, LLC for Radius Global Solutions, LLC (Fleishman, Rachel) (Entered: 02/10/2023)

#13

(#13) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Erik Davis (Lucoff, Joel) (Entered: 02/16/2023)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Settlement pending by Radius Global Solutions, LLC (Fleishman, Rachel) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

#15

(#15) Administrative Order Closing Case After Notice of Settlement. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 2/17/2023. See attached document for full details. (pwn) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Administrative Order Closing Case After Notice of Settlement. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 2/17/2023. See attached document for full details. (pwn) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Settlement pending by Radius Global Solutions, LLC (Fleishman, Rachel) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Erik Davis (Lucoff, Joel) (Entered: 02/16/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Radius Global Solutions, LLC identifying Corporate Parent NGI Acquisition, LLC for Radius Global Solutions, LLC (Fleishman, Rachel) (Entered: 02/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Radius Global Solutions, LLC. Attorney Rachel Megan Fleishman added to party Radius Global Solutions, LLC(pty:dft). (Fleishman, Rachel) (Entered: 02/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dayle Marie Van Hoose on behalf of Radius Global Solutions, LLC. Attorney Dayle Marie Van Hoose added to party Radius Global Solutions, LLC(pty:dft). (Van Hoose, Dayle) (Entered: 02/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Erik Davis (Lucoff, Joel) (Entered: 01/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report, Certificates of Interested Parties and Corporate Disclosure Statements due by 2/17/2023. Signed by Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II on 1/23/2023. See attached document for full details. (jas) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by Erik Davis (Lucoff, Joel) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Erik Davis (Lucoff, Joel) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Erik Davis. RADIUS GLOBAL SOLUTIONS, LLC., served on 1/20/2023, response/answer due 2/10/2023. (Lucoff, Joel) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Filing of Exhibit B by Erik Davis re #1 Complaint (Lucoff, Joel) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to RADIUS GLOBAL SOLUTIONS, LLC. (rbe) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodolfo A. Ruiz, II. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (rbe) (Entered: 01/11/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16229749, filed by Erik Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summon(s))(Lucoff, Joel) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less