This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/19/2021 at 07:55:14 (UTC).

Davis v. Loew's Hotels, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/18/2021 Davis filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Loew's Hotels, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Michael S. Berg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00095

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cathy Ann Bencivengo

Referral Judge

Michael S. Berg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Freeman Ray Davis

Defendants

Loew's Hotels, Inc.

Loews Corporation

Loews Hotels Holding Corporation

DOES 1 to 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thiago M. Coelho

Attorney at Wilshire Law Firm

3055 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90010

 

Court Documents

#2

#3

#4

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Settlement by Freeman Ray Davis (Coelho, Thiago) (anh). (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Freeman Ray Davis, as to Loew's Hotels, Inc.. (Coelho, Thiago) (anh). (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (smd) (sjt). (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against DOES 1 to 10, Loew's Hotels, Inc., Loews Corporation, Loews Hotels Holding Corporation ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-15228785.), filed by Freeman Ray Davis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:21-cv-95-CAB-MSB. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg are assigned to the case. (Coelho, Thiago)(smd)(sjt). (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Loew's Hotels, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where MGM Grand Hotel, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thiago M. Coelho