This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/19/2022 at 08:48:24 (UTC).

Davis v. Kroger Limited Partnership I et al

Case Summary

On 01/18/2022 Davis filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Kroger Limited Partnership I. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Herman N Johnson, Jr and Abdul K Kallon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-00062

  • Filing Date:

    01/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Herman N Johnson, Jr

Abdul K Kallon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wanda Marie Davis

Defendants

Kroger Limited Partnership I

The Kroger Co.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Douglas J Fees

Attorney at THE COCHRAN FIRM - HUNTSVILLE

401-403 Madison Street

Huntsville, AL 35801

Defendant Attorneys

Caroline T Pryor

Attorney at CARR ALLISON PC

6251 Monroe Street Suite 200, Po Box 1126

Daphne, AL 36526

Katherine E Carr

Attorney at CARR ALLISON

212 South Cedar Street

Florence, AL 35630

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) NOTICE by Kroger Limited Partnership I, The Kroger Co. (Pryor, Caroline) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

#16

(#16) SCHEDULING ORDER-Certain time limits apply as set out herein; Objection to mediation by November 29, 2022; Discovery due by January 6,2023; Dispositive Motions due by February 24,2023; Final Pretrial Conference set for June 28,2023 at 09:30 a.m. and Jury Trial set for August 7,2023 at 09:00 a.m. BOTH in Federal Courthouse, Huntsville, AL before Judge Abdul K Kallon. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 02/22/2022. (AKD) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

#15

(#15) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Carr, Katherine) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

#14

(#14) ALND UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS reminding parties of their obligations under FRCP 26(f) - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 1/31/2022. (KSS) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

#13

(#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wanda Marie Davis. filed by Wanda Marie Davis (Fees, Douglas) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

#12

(#12) ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL- Rule 26 Meeting Report due by March 25,2022; Pretrial Conference set for June 28, 2023 at 9:30 a.m. and Jury Trial set for August 7,2023 at 09:00 a.m. BOTH in Federal Courthouse, Huntsville, AL before Judge Abdul K Kallon. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 01/27/2022. (AKD) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE by Kroger Limited Partnership I, The Kroger Co. Initial Disclosures (Pryor, Caroline) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, this action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Abdul K. Kallon. Please use case number 5:22-cv-62-AKK on all subsequent pleadings. Magistrate Judge Herman N. Johnson, Jr. is no longer assigned to the case. (BJL) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

#8

(#8) ORDER: the parties are hereby notified that, unless they unanimously consent to the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge by no later than March 4, 2022, the case will be reassigned to a randomly-drawn district judge for all purposes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 1/19/22. (BJL) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#7

(#7) ORDER: The court SETS a telephone status conference for 9:30 a.m. on Thursday, February 17, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 1/19/22. (BJL) Modified on 1/27/2022 (BJL). (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#6

(#6) ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 1/19/22. (BJL) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kroger Limited Partnership I, The Kroger Co.. filed by Kroger Limited Partnership I, The Kroger Co. (Pryor, Caroline) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Kroger Limited Partnership I, The Kroger Co..(Pryor, Caroline) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND in the company by The Kroger Co.and Kroger Limited Partnership I from Circuit Court of Madison County, Alabama, case number 47-cv-2021-901512 filed by The Kroger Co. and Kroger Limited Partnership I. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(AHI) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE by Kroger Limited Partnership I, The Kroger Co. (Pryor, Caroline) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) SCHEDULING ORDER-Certain time limits apply as set out herein; Objection to mediation by November 29, 2022; Discovery due by January 6,2023; Dispositive Motions due by February 24,2023; Final Pretrial Conference set for June 28,2023 at 09:30 a.m. and Jury Trial set for August 7,2023 at 09:00 a.m. BOTH in Federal Courthouse, Huntsville, AL before Judge Abdul K Kallon. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 02/22/2022. (AKD) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Carr, Katherine) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ALND UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS reminding parties of their obligations under FRCP 26(f) - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 1/31/2022. (KSS) (Entered: 01/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wanda Marie Davis. filed by Wanda Marie Davis (Fees, Douglas) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL- Rule 26 Meeting Report due by March 25,2022; Pretrial Conference set for June 28, 2023 at 9:30 a.m. and Jury Trial set for August 7,2023 at 09:00 a.m. BOTH in Federal Courthouse, Huntsville, AL before Judge Abdul K Kallon. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 01/27/2022. (AKD) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE by Kroger Limited Partnership I, The Kroger Co. Initial Disclosures (Pryor, Caroline) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • Docket(#10) TEXT ORDER: The telephone conference scheduled for 2/17/22 is hereby CANCELED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 1/27/22. (BJL) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: The parties having not unanimously consented to the dispositive jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge, this action has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Abdul K. Kallon. Please use case number 5:22-cv-62-AKK on all subsequent pleadings. Magistrate Judge Herman N. Johnson, Jr. is no longer assigned to the case. (BJL) (Entered: 01/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER: the parties are hereby notified that, unless they unanimously consent to the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge by no later than March 4, 2022, the case will be reassigned to a randomly-drawn district judge for all purposes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 1/19/22. (BJL) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER: The court SETS a telephone status conference for 9:30 a.m. on Thursday, February 17, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 1/19/22. (BJL) Modified on 1/27/2022 (BJL). (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 1/19/22. (BJL) (Entered: 01/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kroger Limited Partnership I, The Kroger Co.. filed by Kroger Limited Partnership I, The Kroger Co. (Pryor, Caroline) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Kroger Limited Partnership I, The Kroger Co..(Pryor, Caroline) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3996234 (B4601118022). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND in the company by The Kroger Co.and Kroger Limited Partnership I from Circuit Court of Madison County, Alabama, case number 47-cv-2021-901512 filed by The Kroger Co. and Kroger Limited Partnership I. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(AHI). (Pryor, Caroline) Modified on 1/20/2022 (BJL). (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Assignment of Case to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial (AHI) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ANSWER WITH JURY DEMAND to Complaint by Kroger Limited Partnership I and The Kroger Co.(AHI) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND in the company by The Kroger Co.and Kroger Limited Partnership I from Circuit Court of Madison County, Alabama, case number 47-cv-2021-901512 filed by The Kroger Co. and Kroger Limited Partnership I. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(AHI) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Kroger Limited Partnership I is a litigant

Latest cases where The Kroger Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Katherine E Carr

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Caroline Thomason Pryor