This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:29:27 (UTC).

Davis v. Kaplan

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Davis filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Kaplan. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Elizabeth A. Wolford. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-06882

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Elizabeth A. Wolford

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Tanisha Davis

Defendant

Superintendent Sabrina Kaplan

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Rhidaya Shodhan Trivedi

Attorney at Law Office of Ronald L. Kuby

119 West 23Rd Street

New York, NY 10011

Defendant Attorneys

Jodi A. Danzig

Attorney at Office of New York State Attorney General

28 Liberty Street, 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10005

Alyson Gill, Arlene Roces, Laura Stockmyer (e-service)

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 0209-3672028.), filed by Tanisha Davis.(Trivedi, Rhidaya) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#2

(#2) CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Tanisha Davis. Civil Cover Sheet filed by Tanisha Davis. (Trivedi, Rhidaya) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Jodi A. Danzig on behalf of Sabrina Kaplan (Danzig, Jodi) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Tanisha Davis. Respondent shall file and serve an answer with memo of law responding to the allegations in the Petition within 90 days of the date of this Order. Petitioner shall have 30 days after the receipt of Respondent's answer or other pleading to file a written reply. The Clerk of Court shall electronically serve a copy of the Petition, together with a copy of this Order, via a Notice of Electronic Filing to the Office of the Attorney General, Federal Habeas Unit. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 12/30/19. (Attachments: #1 petition)(TF) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

3 #1

petition

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Jodi A. Danzig on behalf of Sabrina Kaplan (Danzig, Jodi) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Tanisha Davis. Respondent shall file and serve an answer with memo of law responding to the allegations in the Petition within 90 days of the date of this Order. Petitioner shall have 30 days after the receipt of Respondent's answer or other pleading to file a written reply. The Clerk of Court shall electronically serve a copy of the Petition, together with a copy of this Order, via a Notice of Electronic Filing to the Office of the Attorney General, Federal Habeas Unit. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 12/30/19. (Attachments: #1 petition)(TF) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (LB) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Tanisha Davis. Civil Cover Sheet filed by Tanisha Davis. (Trivedi, Rhidaya) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-Filing Notification: Attorney is directed to file a Civil Cover Sheet re #1 PETITION. Please use the Continuation of Exhibits event found under Responses and Replies. (SG) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 0209-3672028.), filed by Tanisha Davis.(Trivedi, Rhidaya) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.