This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/05/2022 at 07:42:53 (UTC).

Davis v. Johnson et al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2022 Davis filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Johnson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is K. Michael Moore. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-20363

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

K. Michael Moore

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Avery Lamar Davis

Miami, FL 33178

Defendants

T. Johnson

Coleman

FNU Corporal

FNU Nurse

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against Coleman, FNU Corporal, T. Johnson, FNU Nurse. Filing fee $ 402.00. IFP Filed, filed by Avery Lamar Davis.(daa) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

#3

(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Avery Lamar Davis. (daa) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

#4

(#4) ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. The Clerk of Court is INSTRUCTED to transmit a copy of this Order to Plaintiff. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 3/3/2022. See attached document for full details. (thn) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

#5

(#5) ORDER denying #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Accordingly, on or before April 3, 2022, Petitioner shall file the required supporting, certified inmate account statement, or pay the Clerks filing fee of $ 402.00. The Clerk of Court is INSTRUCTED to transmit a copy of this Order to Plaintiff. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 3/3/2022. See attached document for full details. (thn) (Main Document 5 replaced on 3/7/2022) (ar2). (Entered: 03/03/2022)

#6

(#6) Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re: #5 Order denying Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Document Not Signed; Original unsigned document was replaced with the signed order and the signed order is also attached to this notice. (ar2) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Filing Inmate Account Statement by Avery Lamar Davis re #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma Pauperis. (jas) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Filing Inmate Account Statement by Avery Lamar Davis re #5 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma Pauperis. (jas) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re: #5 Order denying Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Document Not Signed; Original unsigned document was replaced with the signed order and the signed order is also attached to this notice. (ar2) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER denying #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Accordingly, on or before April 3, 2022, Petitioner shall file the required supporting, certified inmate account statement, or pay the Clerks filing fee of $ 402.00. The Clerk of Court is INSTRUCTED to transmit a copy of this Order to Plaintiff. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 3/3/2022. See attached document for full details. (thn) (Main Document 5 replaced on 3/7/2022) (ar2). (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. The Clerk of Court is INSTRUCTED to transmit a copy of this Order to Plaintiff. Signed by Judge K. Michael Moore on 3/3/2022. See attached document for full details. (thn) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Avery Lamar Davis. (daa) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • Docket(#2) Judge Assignment to Judge K. Michael Moore. (daa) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against Coleman, FNU Corporal, T. Johnson, FNU Nurse. Filing fee $ 402.00. IFP Filed, filed by Avery Lamar Davis.(daa) (Entered: 02/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COLEMAN is a litigant