This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/31/2020 at 09:31:08 (UTC).

Davis v. Hoverzon, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/01/2020 Davis filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Hoverzon, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Christian F. Hummel and Thomas J. McAvoy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01027

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Christian F. Hummel

Presiding Judge

Thomas J. McAvoy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Angela Davis

Defendants

HSN, Inc.

Hoverzon, LLC

PC Direct, Inc. doing business as Microsel, Inc.

Swagtron

The Home Shopping Network

Swagway, LLC

John Doe Entity (1)-(99)

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David I. Iversen

Attorney at E. Stewart Jones Hacker Murphy, LLP

28 Second Street

Troy, NY 12180

Defendant Attorneys

Carl J. Schaerf

Attorney at Schnader, Harrison Law Firm - New York Office

140 Broadway, Suite 3100

New York, NY 10005-9998

Edward J. Smith, III

Attorney at Smith, Sovik, Kendrick & Sugnet, P.C. - Syracuse Office

250 South Clinton Street, Suite 600

Syracuse, NY 13202-1252

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

2 #1

Summons Issued as to PC Direct, Inc.

2 #2

Summons Issued as to HSN, Inc.

#3

#4

#5

#6

#8

#9

#10

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Edward J. Smith, III on behalf of Hoverzon, LLC (Smith, Edward) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • Docket***Answer due date updated for Hoverzon, LLC answer due 10/23/2020 from affidavit of service for service of complaint on 10/2/2020. (jel, ) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Hoverzon, LLC on 10/02/2020, filed by Angela Davis. (Iversen, David) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Angela Davis.(Iversen, David) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) TEXT ORDER granting #6 Letter Request from Carl J. Schaerf for HSN, Inc. requesting extension of time to appear, answer or move. HSN, Inc. answer due 11/6/2020. Authorized by Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel on 10/9/2020. (tab) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Letter Motion from Carl J. Schaerf for HSN, Inc. requesting extension of time to appear, answer or move submitted to Judge Christian F. Hummel . (Schaerf, Carl) (Entered: 10/06/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • Docket***Answer due date updated for HSN, Inc. answer due 10/9/2020. (dpk) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint with Civil Cover Sheet served on HSN, INC. a/k/a THE HOME SHOPPING NETWORK on 09/17/2020, filed by Angela Davis. (Iversen, David) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • Docket***Answer due date updated for PC Direct, Inc. answer due 10/8/2020. (dpk) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service of Summons and Complaint with Civil Cover Sheet served on PC Direct, Inc., d/b/a MICROSEL, Inc. on 09/15/2020, filed by Angela Davis. (Iversen, David) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketTEXT NOTICE: Although the plaintiff herein has named JohnDoes 1-10 in the Complaint, the Clerk's Office will not issue summonses for service of process on a "John Doe" defendant at this time. In the event plaintiff wishes to pursue the claims against those defendants, plaintiff shall take reasonable steps to ascertain their identities. When plaintiff determines the identity of the"John Doe" defendants, plaintiff may seek to amend the pleading to add the properly named defendants pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 15 and summons will be issued at that time. (dpk) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Conference set for 11/30/2020 at 11:00 AM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Christian F. Hummel. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 11/23/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (dpk) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to HSN, Inc., Hoverzon, LLC and PC Direct, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to PC Direct, Inc., #2 Summons Issued as to HSN, Inc.)(dpk) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against HSN, Inc., Hoverzon, LLC, PC Direct, Inc. and John Doe Entity (1)-(99)(Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-5226077) filed by Angela Davis.(Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(dpk) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HOME SHOPPING NEWTWORK- HSN is a litigant

Latest cases where HOVERZON, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where SWAGWAY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where HSN, Inc. is a litigant