This case was last updated from PACER on 02/09/2020 at 08:05:50 (UTC).

Davis v. Givens (INMATE 2)

Case Summary

On 12/11/2019 Davis filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Givens INMATE 2. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Charles S. Coody and W. Harold Albritton, III. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01040

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Charles S. Coody

Presiding Judge

W. Harold Albritton, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

James Henry Davis

Bessemer, AL 35023-7299

Defendant

Gwendolyn Givens

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: it is the RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge this case be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama under 28 U.S.C. 1406(a); Objections to R&R due by 12/31/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 12/17/2019. (cnw, ) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#2

(#2) Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by James Henry Davis. (es, ) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#1

(#1) Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Gwendolyn Givens, filed by James Henry Davis.(es, ) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER: it is ORDERED that: 1) The Magistrate Judge's recommendation (Doc. #3 ) is adopted; 2) This case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama under 28 U.S.C. 1406(a); The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to take the necessary steps to effectuate the transfer of this action. This case is closed in this court. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 1/13/2020. (cnw, ) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketReceived Email from ALND regarding receipt of e-transfer case; ALND case number assigned as 2:20-cv-00058. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cnw, ) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketCase transferred to Northern District of Alabama. Electronically transferred via CM/ECF transfer to Clerk.(cnw, ) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: it is ORDERED that: 1) The Magistrate Judge's recommendation (Doc. #3 ) is adopted; 2) This case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama under 28 U.S.C. 1406(a); The Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to take the necessary steps to effectuate the transfer of this action. This case is closed in this court. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 1/13/2020. (cnw, ) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNo objections filed to the #3 Recommendation. (No pdf attached to this entry) (cnw, ) (Entered: 01/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: it is the RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge this case be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama under 28 U.S.C. 1406(a); Objections to R&R due by 12/31/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 12/17/2019. (cnw, ) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by James Henry Davis. (es, ) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Gwendolyn Givens, filed by James Henry Davis.(es, ) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.