This case was last updated from PACER on 05/17/2020 at 09:16:47 (UTC).

Davis v. G. Allen Equipment Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 03/18/2020 Davis filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against G Allen Equipment Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Terrence W. Boyle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00049

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terrence W. Boyle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Antonio Davis

Defendants

G. Allen Equipment Corporation

William Lawrence

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Meredith S. Hinton

Attorney at Ricci Law Firm, PA

2839 Charles Boulevard, Post Office Box 483

Greenville, NC 27835-0483

Defendant Attorneys

Katie Terry Jefferson

Attorney at Cranfill Sumner & Hartzog LLP

5420 Wade Park Blvd, Suite 300

Raleigh, NC 27607

Robert Hugh Griffin

Attorney at Cranfill Sumner & Hartzog LLP

P.O. Box 27808

Raleigh, NC 27611

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Antonio Davis. (Hinton, Meredith) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

#16

(#16) ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 4/28/2020. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

#15

(#15) ANSWER to Complaint by G. Allen Equipment Corporation, William Lawrence. (Jefferson, Katie) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

#14

(#14) Memorandum in Support regarding #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by G. Allen Equipment Corporation, William Lawrence. (Jefferson, Katie) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

#13

(#13) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by G. Allen Equipment Corporation, William Lawrence. (Jefferson, Katie) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

#12

(#12) Financial Disclosure Statement by Antonio Davis (Hinton, Meredith) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

#11

(#11) Notice of Appearance filed by Meredith S. Hinton on behalf of Antonio Davis. (Hinton, Meredith) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

6 #5

Exhibit E - Amended Notice of Removal sent to Superior Court

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal. The time for Defendants G. Allen Equipment Corporation and William Lawrence to serve an Answer or otherwise plead is and shall be extended to and including April 24, 2020. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 3/19/2020. Copy sent to Meredith S. Hinton of Ricci Law Firm, P.A. at P. O. Box 483, Greenville, NC 27835 mailed via US Mail on March 19, 2020. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

#4

(#4) Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's Counsel Meredith S. Hinton of Ricci Law Firm, P.A. at P. O. Box 483, Greenville, NC 27835 mailed via US Mail on March 19, 2020. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

3 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#3

(#5) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal. The time for Defendants G. Allen Equipment Corporation and William Lawrence to serve an Answer or otherwise plead is and shall be extended to and including April 24, 2020. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 3/19/2020. Copy sent to Meredith S. Hinton of Ricci Law Firm, P.A. at P. O. Box 483, Greenville, NC 27835 mailed via US Mail on March 19, 2020. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

#2

(#2) Notice of Appearance filed by Katie Terry Jefferson on behalf of G. Allen Equipment Corporation, William Lawrence. (Jefferson, Katie) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B - Notice of Removal sent to Superior Court

1 #1

Exhibit A - Superior Court Action

#1

(#6) AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by G. Allen Equipment Corporation, William Lawrence. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Superior Court Action Summons purportedly served on G. Allen, #2 Exhibit B - Superior Court Action Complaint purportedly served on G. Allen, #3 Exhibit C - Superior Court Action Summons purportedly served on William Lawrence, #4 Exhibit D - Superior Court Action Complaint purportedly served on William Lawrence, #5 Exhibit E - Amended Notice of Removal sent to Superior Court) (Jefferson, Katie) Modified on 3/20/2020 (Stouch, L.). (Entered: 03/19/2020)

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER granting Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time #17 . For good cause shown and with the consent of Defendants, it is ordered that Plaintiff has up to and including May 26, 2020, within which to respond to the Partial Motion to Dismiss #13 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 5/14/2020. (Hockaday, A.) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Antonio Davis. (Hinton, Meredith) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 4/28/2020. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ANSWER to Complaint by G. Allen Equipment Corporation, William Lawrence. (Jefferson, Katie) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Memorandum in Support regarding #13 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by G. Allen Equipment Corporation, William Lawrence. (Jefferson, Katie) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by G. Allen Equipment Corporation, William Lawrence. (Jefferson, Katie) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • DocketCase Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 04/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Financial Disclosure Statement by Antonio Davis (Hinton, Meredith) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Notice of Appearance filed by Meredith S. Hinton on behalf of Antonio Davis. (Hinton, Meredith) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Appearance filed by Robert Hugh Griffin on behalf of G. Allen Equipment Corporation, William Lawrence. (Griffin, Robert) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by G. Allen Equipment Corporation, William Lawrence. Amendment to #1 Notice of Removal, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Superior Court Action Summons purportedly served on G. Allen, #2 Exhibit B - Superior Court Action Complaint purportedly served on G. Allen, #3 Exhibit C - Superior Court Action Summons purportedly served on William Lawrence, #4 Exhibit D - Superior Court Action Complaint purportedly served on William Lawrence, #5 Exhibit E - Amended Notice of Removal sent to Superior Court) (Jefferson, Katie) Modified on 3/20/2020 (Stouch, L.). (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER granting #3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal. The time for Defendants G. Allen Equipment Corporation and William Lawrence to serve an Answer or otherwise plead is and shall be extended to and including April 24, 2020. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 3/19/2020. Copy sent to Meredith S. Hinton of Ricci Law Firm, P.A. at P. O. Box 483, Greenville, NC 27835 mailed via US Mail on March 19, 2020. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding #3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Notice regarding #1 Notice of Removal and requirement to make a Notice of Appearance sent to Plaintiff's Counsel Meredith S. Hinton of Ricci Law Firm, P.A. at P. O. Box 483, Greenville, NC 27835 mailed via US Mail on March 19, 2020. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketNotice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to G. Allen Equipment Corporation, William Lawrence. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 03/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding #1 Notice of Removal, filed by G. Allen Equipment Corporation, William Lawrence. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Jefferson, Katie) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Appearance filed by Katie Terry Jefferson on behalf of G. Allen Equipment Corporation, William Lawrence. (Jefferson, Katie) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by William Lawrence, G. Allen Equipment Corporation from Halifax County Superior Court, case number 20 CVS 124. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5360715), filed by William Lawrence, G. Allen Equipment Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Superior Court Action, #2 Exhibit B - Notice of Removal sent to Superior Court, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Removal Cover Sheet) (Jefferson, Katie) (Entered: 03/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less