This case was last updated from PACER on 03/09/2020 at 08:30:02 (UTC).

Davis v. Equifax, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/09/2020 Davis filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Equifax, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard M Gergel and Mary Gordon Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00094

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard M Gergel

Referral Judge

Mary Gordon Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hershula R Davis

Goose Creek, SC 29445

Defendant

Equifax, Inc.

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Equifax, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 300085427.), filed by Hershula R Davis. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope)(hada, ) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

#10

(#10) Summons Issued as to Equifax, Inc.. Service due by 5/12/2020. (hada, ) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

1 #2

Envelope

#4

(#4) PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 2/21/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 01/31/2020. (hada, ) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

1 #1

Supporting Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ***DOCUMENT MAILED 9 Order Service, #10 Summons Issued placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Hershula R Davis 111 Commons Way Goose Creek, SC 29445 (hada, ) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Summons Issued as to Equifax, Inc.. Service due by 5/12/2020. (hada, ) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2020
  • Docket(#9) TEXT ORDER The Clerk of Court is directed to issue the proposed summons Plaintiff submitted (Dkt. No. 7.) Plaintiff is responsible for accomplishing service of process on Defendant in accordance with Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 02/11/2020. (hada, ) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ***DOCUMENT MAILED #4 Proper Form Order with required documents, placed in U.S. Mail from Charleston Clerks Office to Hershula R Davis 111 Commons Way Goose Creek, SC 29445 (hada, ) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) PROPER FORM ORDER Case to be brought into proper form by 2/21/2020. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 01/31/2020. (hada, ) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Equifax, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 300085427.), filed by Hershula R Davis. (Attachments: #1 Supporting Documents, #2 Envelope)(hada, ) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.