This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/08/2022 at 07:37:34 (UTC).

DAVIS v. DELAWARE COUNTY SHERIFF TONY SKINNER et al

Case Summary

On 02/07/2022 DAVIS filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against DELAWARE COUNTY SHERIFF TONY SKINNER. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James R. Sweeney II and Doris L. Pryor. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00274

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James R. Sweeney II

Referral Judge

Doris L. Pryor

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CLIFFORD DAVIS

Defendants

DELAWARE COUNTY SHERIFF TONY SKINNER

CITY OF MUNCIE

HARLEY PAGEL

CURTIS

WALKER

W CARDINAL

DAN WALTERS

KURT WALTHAUR

S KEEPLER

BOWMAN

ROWE

JASON ROBERTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher Carson Myers

Attorney at CHRISTOPHER C. MYERS & ASSOCIATES

809 South Calhoun Street, Suite 400

Fort Wayne, IN 46802

Ilene M. Smith

Attorney at CHRISTOPHER C. MEYERS & ASSOCIATES

809 S. Calhoun St., Suite 400

Fort Wayne, IN 46802

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel Mark Witte

Attorney at TRAVELERS STAFF COUNSEL INDIANA

P.O. Box 64093

St. Paul, MN 55164-0093

Daenayia Harris

Attorney at Freeman Mathis & Gary, LLP

2525 Harroldsburg Rd., Suite 500

Lexington, KY 40504

Tia J. Combs

Attorney at FREEMAN MATHIS & GARY, LLP

2525 Harrodsburg Road, Suite 500

Lexington, KY 40504

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

State Court Record Docket; Motion; Appearance; Complaint; Summons; Summons; Summ

1 #2

Exhibit Complaint

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Mark Witte on behalf of Defendants BOWMAN, W CARDINAL, CURTIS, DELAWARE COUNTY SHERIFF TONY SKINNER, S KEEPLER, HARLEY PAGEL, JASON ROBERTS, JASON ROBERTS, ROWE, WALKER, DAN WALTERS, KURT WALTHAUR. (Witte, Daniel) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand , filed by BOWMAN, W CARDINAL, CURTIS, DELAWARE COUNTY SHERIFF TONY SKINNER, S KEEPLER, HARLEY PAGEL, JASON ROBERTS, ROWE, WALKER, DAN WALTERS, KURT WALTHAUR.(Witte, Daniel) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

#7

(#7) Submission of State Court Record from Delaware County in case number 18C02-2201-CT-000007. (JDC) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Tia J. Combs on behalf of Defendant CITY OF MUNCIE. (Combs, Tia) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Daenayia Harris on behalf of Defendant CITY OF MUNCIE. (Harris, Daenayia) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand , filed by CITY OF MUNCIE.(Combs, Tia) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

#8

(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER-TELEPHONIC Initial Pretrial Conference set for 4/20/2022 at 3:00 PM (Eastern) before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 2/22/2022.(CBU) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

9 #9

Main Document

9 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#10

(#10) ORDER #9 - The court being duly advised now GRANTS the parties' stipulation to dismiss only City of Muncie with prejudice. Fees and costs will be paid by each party. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 2/28/2022. (JDC) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER #9 - The court being duly advised now GRANTS the parties' stipulation to dismiss only City of Muncie with prejudice. Fees and costs will be paid by each party. Signed by Judge James R. Sweeney II on 2/28/2022. (JDC) (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION of Dismissal , as to Defendant CITY OF MUNCIE, filed by CLIFFORD DAVIS. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Myers, Christopher) (Entered: 02/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER-TELEPHONIC Initial Pretrial Conference set for 4/20/2022 at 3:00 PM (Eastern) before Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor. The information needed to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by a separate notification. Signed by Magistrate Judge Doris L. Pryor on 2/22/2022.(CBU) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand , filed by CITY OF MUNCIE.(Combs, Tia) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Daenayia Harris on behalf of Defendant CITY OF MUNCIE. (Harris, Daenayia) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Tia J. Combs on behalf of Defendant CITY OF MUNCIE. (Combs, Tia) (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Submission of State Court Record from Delaware County in case number 18C02-2201-CT-000007. (JDC) (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) with Jury Demand , filed by BOWMAN, W CARDINAL, CURTIS, DELAWARE COUNTY SHERIFF TONY SKINNER, S KEEPLER, HARLEY PAGEL, JASON ROBERTS, ROWE, WALKER, DAN WALTERS, KURT WALTHAUR.(Witte, Daniel) (Entered: 02/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Mark Witte on behalf of Defendants BOWMAN, W CARDINAL, CURTIS, DELAWARE COUNTY SHERIFF TONY SKINNER, S KEEPLER, HARLEY PAGEL, JASON ROBERTS, JASON ROBERTS, ROWE, WALKER, DAN WALTERS, KURT WALTHAUR. (Witte, Daniel) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Delaware County Circuit Court 2, case number 18C02-2201-CT-000007, filed by WALKER, BOWMAN, W CARDINAL, KURT WALTHAUR, ROWE, DELAWARE COUNTY SHERIFF TONY SKINNER, JASON ROBERTS(OFFICER), DAN WALTERS, HARLEY PAGEL, S KEEPLER, CURTIS. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AINSDC-6959545) (Attachments: #1 State Court Record Docket; Motion; Appearance; Complaint; Summons; Summons; Summons; Summons; Summons; Summons; Summons; Summons; Summons; Summons; Summons; Summons; Order; Appearance; Motion; Order; Appearance; Motion; Notice, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Witte, Daniel) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Rowe is a litigant

Latest cases where BOWMAN is a litigant

Latest cases where Curtis is a litigant

Latest cases where Walker is a litigant