Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 11/17/2020 at 09:16:19 (UTC).

Davis v. Davis Media, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 Davis filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Davis Media, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Douglas E. Miller, Arenda L. Wright Allen and Roderick C. Young. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00147

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Douglas E. Miller

Presiding Judges

Arenda L. Wright Allen

Roderick C. Young

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Thomas G. Davis

Defendants

Tom Bendetti

Peter Ill

Davis Media, LLC doing business as Local Voice Media

Michael Dufort

E. Jack Stewart

C/O Corporation Service Company

Counter Claimant

Davis Media, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Elyse L. Strickland

Attorney at McMillan Metro, P.C.

4800 Montgomery Lane, Suite 900 9Th Floor

Bethesda, MD 20814

David Lee Amos

Attorney at Whiteford Taylor & Preston LLP (VA)

3190 Fairview Park Dr, Suite 800

Falls Church, VA 22042

Stephen Matthew Faraci

Attorney at Whiteford Taylor & Preston LLP (Richmond)

Two James Center, 1021 E Cary Street, Suite 1700

Richmond, VA 23219

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Brett Alexander Spain

Attorney at Willcox & Savage PC

440 Monticello Ave, Suite 2200

Norfolk, VA 23510

Christopher Massaroni

677 Broadway, Suite 301

Albany, NY 12207

Scott Christopher Paton

677 Broadway, Suite 301

Albany, NY 12207

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Plaintiff's deadline to respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 11) and Counterclaim (ECF No. 13) is hereby extended to January 8,2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 11/13/20. (afar) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

#19

(#19) ORDER granting #17 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Signed by District Judge Roderick C. Young on 11/12/20. (bpet, ) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

18 #1

Exhibit 1

#18

(#18) MOTION for Extension Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Extension of Time by Thomas G. Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Faraci, Stephen) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

17 #1

Exhibit 1

#17

(#17) MOTION to Substitute Attorney Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Substitution by Thomas G. Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Faraci, Stephen) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

15 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Order Extending time

#15

(#15) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Thomas G. Davis. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Extending time)(Strickland, Elyse) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

14 #1

Exhibit A

5 #2

Exhibit 2

5 #1

Exhibit 1

#5

(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File; all defendants to respond to the Complaint by 10/16/20. Order entered AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 9/24/20. (bpet, ) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

#4

(#4) Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a trademark. (epri, ) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#3

(#3) Magistrate Judge Notice and Judge's Information to counsel. (epri, ) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

#2

(#2) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Davis Media, LLC. (Spain, Brett) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit 1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7406437.), filed by Peter Ill, Davis Media, LLC, Michael Dufort, Tom Bendetti, E. Jack Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1)(Spain, Brett) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Plaintiff's deadline to respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 11) and Counterclaim (ECF No. 13) is hereby extended to January 8,2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 11/13/20. (afar) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER granting #17 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Signed by District Judge Roderick C. Young on 11/12/20. (bpet, ) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller: #18 MOTION for Extension Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Extension of Time. (bpet, ) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION for Extension Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Extension of Time by Thomas G. Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Faraci, Stephen) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION to Substitute Attorney Plaintiff's Consent Motion for Substitution by Thomas G. Davis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Faraci, Stephen) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. Plaintiff to respond to the #11 Motion to Dismiss and the #14 Counterclaim by 11/13/2020; Defendant may reply re #11 by 12/11/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 10/30/20. (bpet, ) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Thomas G. Davis. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Extending time)(Strickland, Elyse) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketCase Reassigned to District Judge Roderick C. Young. District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen no longer assigned to the case. (bpet, ) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Correction re #14 Counterclaim: The filing user has been advised that a Counterclaim does not need to be filed separately from the Answer when they are both contained in a single document. The Clerk's Office will remove the duplicative parties created by this docket entry. (bpet, ) (Entered: 10/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) COUNTERCLAIM against Thomas G. Davis, COUNTERCLAIM against Thomas G. Davis, filed by Davis Media, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Spain, Brett) (Entered: 10/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #7 , a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Scott Christopher Paton as certified by local counsel Brett A. Spain for Tom Bendetti, Davis Media, LLC, Michael Dufort, Peter Ill, E. Jack Stewart. Signed by District Judge Arenda L. Wright Allen on 10/02/2020. (Allen, Arenda) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Christopher Massaroni and Certification of Local Counsel Brett A. Spain Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7420220. by Tom Bendetti, Davis Media, LLC, Michael Dufort, Peter Ill, E. Jack Stewart. (Spain, Brett) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Scott Christopher Paton and Certification of Local Counsel Brett A. Spain Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7420206. by Tom Bendetti, Davis Media, LLC, Michael Dufort, Peter Ill, E. Jack Stewart. (Spain, Brett) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File; all defendants to respond to the Complaint by 10/16/20. Order entered AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller on 9/24/20. (bpet, ) (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSetDeadlines as to #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. Motion Hearing set for 9/24/2020 at 12:30 PM in Norfolk Remote before Magistrate Judge Douglas E. Miller. (cdod, ) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Tom Bendetti, Davis Media, LLC, Michael Dufort, Peter Ill, E. Jack Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3 - Proposed Order)(Spain, Brett) (Entered: 09/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a trademark. (epri, ) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Magistrate Judge Notice and Judge's Information to counsel. (epri, ) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Davis Media, LLC. (Spain, Brett) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7406437.), filed by Peter Ill, Davis Media, LLC, Michael Dufort, Tom Bendetti, E. Jack Stewart. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1)(Spain, Brett) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott Christopher Paton

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brett Alexander Spain