This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/07/2022 at 05:46:47 (UTC).

Davis v. Circle K Stores Inc et al

Case Summary

On 06/01/2022 Davis filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Circle K Stores Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph Dawson, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-01714

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph Dawson, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nicholas Davis

Defendants

Circle K Stores Inc

Land Lease Holdings LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Fred Oliver

Attorney at The Derrick Law Firm

901 Main Street

Conway, SC 29526

Defendant Attorneys

Adam Miles Crain

Attorney at Sweeny Wingate and Barrow PA

1515 Lady Street, Po Box 12129

Columbia, SC 29201

Ryan Charles Holt

Attorney at Sweeny Wingate and Barrow PA

1515 Lady Street, Po Box 12129

Columbia, SC 29201

J Christopher Clark

Attorney at McAngus Goudelock and Courie

2411 N Oak Street, Suite 401

Myrtle Beach, SC 29577

James Harrison Berry

Attorney at McAngus Goudelock and Courie

2411 N Oak Street, Suite 401

Myrtle Beach, SC 29577

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

State Court Documents

1 #2

Defendant Land Lease Holdings LLC's State Court Answer

#3

(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Circle K Stores Inc.(hcic, ) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Circle K Stores Inc. (hcic, ) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

#5

(#5) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER.Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 6/22/2022, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 7/6/2022, Rule 26 Report due by 7/6/2022, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 7/27/2022, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 8/26/2022, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 9/26/2022, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 9/26/2022, Discovery due by 11/28/2022, Motions due by 12/28/2022, Jury Selection Deadline 3/28/2023, Mediation Due by 11/28/2022. Signed by the Honorable Joseph Dawson, III on 6/1/2022. (lgib, ) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

#6

(#6) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Nicholas Davis. Response to Motion due by 6/21/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Oliver, Fred) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Nicholas Davis. Response to Motion due by 6/21/2022. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Oliver, Fred) (Entered: 06/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER.Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 6/22/2022, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 7/6/2022, Rule 26 Report due by 7/6/2022, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 7/27/2022, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 8/26/2022, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 9/26/2022, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 9/26/2022, Discovery due by 11/28/2022, Motions due by 12/28/2022, Jury Selection Deadline 3/28/2023, Mediation Due by 11/28/2022. Signed by the Honorable Joseph Dawson, III on 6/1/2022. (lgib, ) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Circle K Stores Inc. (hcic, ) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Circle K Stores Inc.(hcic, ) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Horry County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2022-CP-26-02643 (filing fee $402 receipt number ASCDC-10519856), filed by Circle K Stores Inc. (Attachments: #1 State Court Documents, #2 Defendant Land Lease Holdings LLC's State Court Answer)(hcic, ) (Entered: 06/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Circle K Stores Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James H Berry, Jr

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John C. Clark

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Adam Miles Crain