This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/17/2020 at 13:37:05 (UTC).

Davis v. Carpenter

Case Summary

On 12/19/2019 Davis filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Carpenter. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Colin Stirling Bruce and Eric I. Long. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02337

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colin Stirling Bruce

Referral Judge

Eric I. Long

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dennis Davis

Defendant

Tracy Carpenter

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Chae Lee

Attorney at PATEL LAW PC

108 W University Avenue

Urbana, IL 61801

Defendant Attorneys

James A Foster

Attorney at CASSIDAY SCHADE LLP

Suite 2900, 222 W Adams Street

Chicago, IL 60606

Justin John Kaszuba

Attorney at CASSIDAY SCHADE LLP

Suite 2900, 222 West Adams Street

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation to Dismiss by Tracy Carpenter(as Special Representative of Michael Fleming Sr, deceased). (Kaszuba, Justin) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by James A Foster on behalf of Tracy Carpenter(as Special Representative of Michael Fleming Sr, deceased) (Foster, James) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 12/20/2019. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 2/7/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom B in Urbana before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. See written Order.(DS, ilcd) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Justin John Kaszuba on behalf of Tracy Carpenter (Kaszuba, Justin) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit Exhibit 4 for Defs' Notice of Removal

1 #3

Exhibit Exhibit 3 for Defs' Notice of Removal

1 #2

Exhibit Exhibit 2 for Defs' Notice of Removal

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1 for Defs' Notice of Removal

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL Defendants' Notice of Removal to Federal Court from Sixth Judicial - Champaign County, IL, case number 19 L 176 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3266222), filed by Tracy Carpenter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 for Defs' Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 for Defs' Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 for Defs' Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 for Defs' Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Kaszuba, Justin) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 1/31/20. Pursuant to Joint Stipulation to Dismiss #5 and Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, this matter is hereby terminated. All pending motions are denied as moot and all scheduled deadlines and court settings are vacated. Civil Case Terminated. (KM, ilcd) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint Stipulation to Dismiss by Tracy Carpenter(as Special Representative of Michael Fleming Sr, deceased). (Kaszuba, Justin) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by James A Foster on behalf of Tracy Carpenter(as Special Representative of Michael Fleming Sr, deceased) (Foster, James) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference entered by Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long on 12/20/2019. Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 2/7/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom B in Urbana before Magistrate Judge Eric I. Long. See written Order.(DS, ilcd) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Justin John Kaszuba on behalf of Tracy Carpenter (Kaszuba, Justin) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL Defendants' Notice of Removal to Federal Court from Sixth Judicial - Champaign County, IL, case number 19 L 176 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-3266222), filed by Tracy Carpenter. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 for Defs' Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 for Defs' Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 for Defs' Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 for Defs' Notice of Removal, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Kaszuba, Justin) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less