This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/05/2020 at 07:51:25 (UTC).

Davis v. Caliber Home Loans, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/06/2019 Davis filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Caliber Home Loans, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Terrence W. Boyle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00496

  • Filing Date:

    11/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Courthouse:

    North Carolina Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terrence W. Boyle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gary Davis

Defendant

Caliber Home Loans, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Craig M. Shapiro

Attorney at Law Offices of John T. Orcutt, P.C.

1738 Hillandale Road, Suite D

Durham, NC 27705

Defendant Attorney

Jeffrey D. Patton

Attorney at Spilman Thomas & Battle, PLLC

110 Oakwood Drive, Suite 500

Winston-Salem, NC 27103

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 12/4/2019. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Caliber Home Loans, Inc. (Patton, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gary Davis. Caliber Home Loans, Inc. served on 11/13/2019, answer due 12/4/2019. (Shapiro, Craig) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Caliber Home Loans, Inc. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*). (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

#3

(#3) Financial Disclosure Statement by GARY DAVIS (Shapiro, Craig) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

#2

(#2) Notice of Appearance filed by Craig M. Shapiro on behalf of GARY DAVIS. (Shapiro, Craig) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Caliber Home Loans, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5173168.), filed by GARY DAVIS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Shapiro, Craig) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2019
  • Case Selected for Mediation - A printable list of certified mediators for the Eastern District of North Carolina is available on the court's Website, http://www.nced.uscourts.gov/attorney/mediators.aspx. Please serve this list on all parties. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER FOR DISCOVERY PLAN sent to all parties. Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 12/4/2019. (Stouch, L.) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Caliber Home Loans, Inc. (Patton, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gary Davis. Caliber Home Loans, Inc. served on 11/13/2019, answer due 12/4/2019. (Shapiro, Craig) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Caliber Home Loans, Inc. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*). (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Financial Disclosure Statement by GARY DAVIS (Shapiro, Craig) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Notice of Appearance filed by Craig M. Shapiro on behalf of GARY DAVIS. (Shapiro, Craig) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Caliber Home Loans, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5173168.), filed by GARY DAVIS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Shapiro, Craig) (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Caliber Home Loans, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Craig M. Shapiro