This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/29/2021 at 17:37:36 (UTC).

Davis v. Auto-Owners Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 05/26/2021 Davis filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Auto-Owners Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Christine M. Arguello and Scott T. Varholak. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01427

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Christine M. Arguello

Referral Judge

Scott T. Varholak

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Eddye Davis

Defendant

Auto-Owners Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Patricia A. Meester

Attorney at Franklin D. Azar & Associates PC-Aurora

14426 East Evans Avenue

Aurora, CO 80014-1474

Defendant Attorneys

Hannah Rachel Seifert

Attorney at Spencer Fane LLP-Denver

1700 Lincoln Street, Suite 2000

Denver, CO 80203

Evan Bennett Stephenson

Attorney at Spencer Fane LLP-Denver

1700 Lincoln, Suite 2000

Denver, CO 80203

 

Court Documents

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#8

#6

#5

#4

#2

1 #19

Federal Civil Cover Sheet

1 #15

State Court - Order Following Remand on Defendant's Motion to Set Aside En

1 #14

State Court - Case Management Order regarding Procedures for Audiovisual Hearin

1 #9

State Court - Order re: Findings and Judgment

1 #4

State Court - District Court Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

State Court - Complaint

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 7/29/2021. (morti, ) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MINUTE ENTRY for Telephonic Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 7/29/2021. Discovery due by 3/15/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 4/15/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/22/2022 09:45 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. FTR: 402. (morti, ) (Entered: 07/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Seifert, Hannah) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Seifert, Hannah) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to #4 Complaint and Jury Demand by Auto-Owners Insurance Company.(Seifert, Hannah) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Patricia A. Meester on behalf of Eddye DavisAttorney Patricia A. Meester added to party Eddye Davis(pty:pla) (Meester, Patricia) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 7/29/2021 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Proposed Scheduling Order due 7/22/2021, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 5/27/2021. (jgonz, ) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • Docket(#9) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Magistrate Judge Varholak is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference and should be available for trial accordingly. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. The Magistrate Judge, at his/her discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 5/27/2021. Text Only Entry (cmasec) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (jtorr, ) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • Docket(#7) Case assigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STATE COURT ORDER Granting Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Defendant Dayjah Powe Without Prejudice by Arapahoe County District Court Judge Elizabeth Beebe Volz on 9/15/2020. (jtorr, ) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Ameded AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint, and District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet upon Auto-Owners Insurance Company on 05/13/2020 (jtorr, ) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COMPLAINT against Auto-Owners Insurance Company, filed by Eddye Davis.(jtorr, ) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • Docket(#3) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, ) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Stephenson, Evan) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Auto-Owners Insurance Company from Arapahoe County District Court, Case Number 2020cv30988. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number 1082-7887301), filed by Auto-Owners Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #2 State Court - Complaint, #3 State Court - Summons, #4 State Court - District Court Civil Cover Sheet, #5 State Court - Delay Reduction Order, #6 State Court - Amended Affidavit of Service, #7 State Court - Order for Entry of Default and Default Judgment Against Defendant Auto-Owners Insurance Company, #8 State Court - Order Granting Stipulated Motion to Dismiss Defendant Dayjah Powe Without Prejudice, #9 State Court - Order re: Findings and Judgment, #10 State Court - Order re: Plaintiff's Motion for Award of Attorney's Fees, #11 State Court - Order regarding Plaintiff's Bill of Costs, #12 State Court - Order Granting with Amendments Defendant's Motion to Stay Enforcement of Order re Findings and Judgment, #13 State Court - Order: No Action Taken on Defendant's Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default and Default Judgment, #14 State Court - Case Management Order regarding Procedures for Audiovisual Hearings Conducted in Division 202 During the Covid-19 Pandemic, #15 State Court - Order Following Remand on Defendant's Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default Judgment, #16 State Court - Order Granting Defendant's Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default Judgment, #17 State Court - Order on Motion for Clarification on Order Setting Aside Default Judgment, #18 State Court - Waiver of Service, #19 Federal Civil Cover Sheet)(Seifert, Hannah) (Entered: 05/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Auto-Owners Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hannah R. Seifert

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Evan Bennett Stephenson