This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/22/2022 at 08:33:49 (UTC).

Davis, Jr. et al v. City Of Boynton Beach et al

Case Summary

On November 15, 2022, Stanley Davis, Jr., Shannon Thompson, and the Estate of Stanley Davis, III (collectively, “Plaintiffs”), represented by Jasmine Rand of Rand Law, L.L.C., Benjamin Crump of Ben Crump Law, PLLC, and Sue-Ann Robinson of Frontline Law, filed a civil rights lawsuit against the City Of Boynton Beach and Mark Sohn (collectively, “Defendants”), seeking injunctive relief and damages for the alleged violation of the plaintiffs’ civil rights. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of Florida with Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks presiding.

In the complaint, the plaintiffs stated, “Stanley Davis, III was a 13-year-old African American minor child who was unlawfully chased in a high-speed police pursuit by a BPD officer Defendant Mark Sohn on December 26, 2021. The manner in which Defendant Sohn maneuvered his vehicle in the high- speed pursuit caused a fatal crash resulting in the minor child’s death on December 26, 2021.”

Plaintiffs alleged that “Defendant Mark Sohn has caused the death of three African American citizens of the City of Boynton Beach by conducting unlawful high speed police chases, has been sued several times in the past for using excessive force against African Americans, has been disciplined at work for using racist language, and has a long and documented history of misconduct in the context of his employment with the City of Boynton Beach.”

The plaintiffs then claimed, “Prior to the subject incident, Stanley express his fear of Defendant Sohn because he had already killed two other African Americans, and had a history of physically abusing, brutalizing, and terrorizing the Black community in Boynton Beach, Florida.”

The plaintiffs claimed that “Defendant Sohn’s actions were clearly unreasonable as Sergeant Whitefield, another officer that witnessed the incident made the decision not engage in a pursuit of decedent and stated during the Boynton Beach internal investigation interview that although he sees numerous bikes he does not attempt to conduct traffic stops.”

Plaintiffs also alleged that “Defendant City of Boynton Beach failed to terminate Defendant Sohn’s employment after he killed Cyrus Deal, despite knowing that he posed a danger of causing death to innocent citizens by conducting unlawful high-speed pursuits and violated their constitutional rights and showed a disregard for killing a Black male.”

The plaintiffs further alleged, “Defendant Sohn violated the substantive due process rights of Stanley Davis, III,when he conducted an unlawful high speed vehicular pursuit depriving him of bodily integrity, life, liberty, and substantive due process of law. Defendant Sohn’s decision to conduct a unlawful vehicular pursuit of a thirteen-year-old on a dirt bike shocks the conscience; particularly in light of the fact he had already caused the death of two other African Americans during vehicular pursuits.”

Plaintiffs presented three claims for relief, including the alleged deprivation of substantive due process, the alleged deliberate indifference to a serious medical need, the alleged violation of equal protection clause, and negligence. 

In the prayer for relief, the plaintiffs requested declaratory relief, injunctive relief, compensatory damages, punitive damages, costs of this action, and reasonable attorneys’ fees. 

This is a summary of a legal complaint. All statements, claims, and allegations listed herein reflect the position of the plaintiff only and do not represent the position of UniCourt. Additionally, this case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the current status of this case. To view the latest case updates and court documents, please sign up for a UniCourt account.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    9:22-CV-81773

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Donald M. Middlebrooks

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Stanley Davis, Jr.

Shannon Thompson

Estate of Stanley Davis, III

Defendants

City Of Boynton Beach

Mark Sohn

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jasmine Olivia Mae Rand

Attorney at Parks , Crump, L.L.C.

240 North Magnolia Drive

Tallahassee, FL 32301

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summon(s)

1 #3

Summon(s)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to City Of Boynton Beach, Mark Sohn. (aao) (Main Document 3 replaced on 11/16/2022) (aao). (Entered: 11/15/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Clerk's NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Benjamin Lloyd Crump, Sue-Ann Nicole Robinson on behalf of Stanley Davis, Jr., Estate of Stanley Davis, III, Shannon Thompson. Attorney Benjamin Lloyd Crump added to party Estate of Stanley Davis, III(pty:pla), Attorney Sue-Ann Nicole Robinson added to party Estate of Stanley Davis, III(pty:pla) per DE #1 . (aao) Modified text on 11/16/2022 (asl). (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to City Of Boynton Beach, Mark Sohn. (aao) (Main Document 3 replaced on 11/16/2022) (aao). (Entered: 11/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (aao) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-16102819, filed by Stanley Davis, Jr., Estate of Stanley Davis, III, Shannon Thompson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s))(Rand, Jasmine) (Entered: 11/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less