This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/24/2021 at 09:16:54 (UTC).

Davis et al v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company et al

Case Summary

On 07/26/2021 Davis filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael L. Brown. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02988

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael L. Brown

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Vicki H. Davis

Robin R. Trawick

Defendants

State Farm Fire and Casualty Company

Don Allen

Georgia Office of Insurance and Safety Fire Commissioner

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

J. Remington Huggins

Attorney at Huggins Law Firm, LLC

110 Norcross Street

Roswell, GA 30075

Joseph Calvin Cargile

Attorney at Whitehurst, Blackburn & Warren

809 S. Broad St.

Thomasville, GA 31792

Michael Davis Turner

Attorney at Huggins Law Firm, LLC

110 Norcross Street

Roswell, GA 30075

Cliffton M. Jacques

Attorney at Attorney General's Office-Atl

40 Capitol Square, Sw

Atlanta, GA 30334

Defendant Attorneys

Sabrina Lynn Atkins

Attorney at Swift Currie McGhee & Hiers

1355 Peachtree Street, Nesuite 300

Atlanta, GA 30309

Thomas Daryl Martin

Attorney at Swift Currie McGhee & Hiers

1355 Peachtree Street, N.E.

The Peachtree, SU 300

Jordan Alexander Weber

Attorney at Georgia Department of Law

40 Capitol Square, S.W.

Atlanta, GA 30334-1300

James Charles Champlin, IV

Attorney at Department of Law-04

40 Capitol Sq Sw

Atlanta, GA 30334

 

Court Documents

#22

#21

20 #2

Exhibit Warrant Application

20 #1

Exhibit Attempts to depose Allen

#20

18 #1

Brief In Support oOf Their Motion To Stay Discovery And Discovery-Related Procee

#18

17 #1

Brief In Support Of Defendants Don Allen And Georgia Office Of Insurance And Saf

#17

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit -B -Answer and AMended Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit -A -Pleadings and Process Served on Defendants

#1

46 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #17 MOTION to Dismiss , to District Judge Michael L. Brown. (dob) (Entered: 09/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) REPLY to Response to Motion re #17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Don Allen, Georgia Office of Insurance and Safety Fire Commissioner. (Champlin, James) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketRefund in the amount of $402.00 has been processed, effective 9/13/2021 in response to Clerks Action on Application for Refund of Fees paid online. (kns) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER: Defendants Don Allen and Georgia Office of Insurance and Safety Fire Commissioner (collectively "State Defendants"), request that the Court stay proceedings pending resolution of the State Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. #17 ). (Dkt. #18 .) Plaintiffs did not respond to the State Defendants' motion to stay and it is deemed unopposed. LR 7.1B, NDGa. For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS the State Defendants' Motion to Stay Proceedings (Dkt. #18 ). The Court STAYS discovery in this action pending resolution of the State Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. #17 ). Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 9/13/2021. (tmf) (Entered: 09/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #18 MOTION to Stay , to District Judge Michael L. Brown. (tmf) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) RESPONSE in Opposition re #17 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Vicki H. Davis, Robin R. Trawick. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attempts to depose Allen, #2 Exhibit Warrant Application)(Cargile, Joseph) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 8/26/2021. (dgs) (ADI) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION to Stay with Brief In Support by Don Allen, Georgia Office of Insurance and Safety Fire Commissioner. (Attachments: #1 Brief In Support oOf Their Motion To Stay Discovery And Discovery-Related Proceedings)(Champlin, James) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION to Dismiss with Brief In Support by Don Allen, Georgia Office of Insurance and Safety Fire Commissioner. (Attachments: #1 Brief In Support Of Defendants Don Allen And Georgia Office Of Insurance And Safety Fire Commissioner's Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs' Fourth Amended Complaint)(Champlin, James) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ANSWER to #12 Amended Complaint by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 Policy, #2 Exhibit Exh. 2 - 1-6-17 letter, #3 Exhibit Exh. 3 - 4-19-17 letter, #4 Exhibit Exh. 4 - 11-17-17, #5 Exhibit Exh. 5 - 2-7-18 letter, #6 Exhibit Exh. 6 - 3-2-18 letter, #7 Exhibit Exh. 7 - 7-3-18 letter, #8 Exhibit Exh. 8 - 9-18-18 letter, #9 Exhibit Exh. 9 - 10-2-18 letter, #10 Exhibit Exh. 10 - 11-2-18 letter, #11 Exhibit Exh. 11 11-20-18 letter)(Atkins, Sabrina) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STANDING ORDER regarding civil litigation. Signed by Judge Michael L. Brown on 1/11/2021. (bgt) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #6 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT by Don Allen and Georgia Office of Insurance and Safety Fire Commissioner. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal) (eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE Of Filing, Notice of Appearance of Cliffton Jacques and Substitution of Counsel for Jordan Weber by Don Allen. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal) (eop) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER of State Court of Gwinnett County re: Order GRANTING Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to Add Party Defendant, (Georgia Office of Insurance and Fire Safety Commissioner); and DENYING Defendant, Don Allen's Motion to Dismiss) (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal) (eop) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against Don Allen, Georgia Office of Insurance and Safety Fire Commissioner and State Farm Fire and Casualty Company with Jury Demand filed by Vicki H. Davis and Robin R. Trawick. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Don Allen and State Farm Fire and Casualty Companywith Jury Demand filed by Vicki H. Davis and Robin R. Trawick. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Don Allen and State Farm Fire and Casualty Company with Jury Demand filed by Vicki H. Davis and Robin R. Trawick. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified text on 7/27/2021 (eop). (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SPECIAL APPEARANCE ANSWER to #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand by Don Allen. Discovery ends on 12/23/2021. (Filed in State Court and included with Notice of Removal)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by Georgia Office of Insurance and Safety Fire Commissioner. (Filing fee $ 402.00 receipt number BGANDC-11135788) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit -A -Pleadings and Process Served on Defendants, #2 Exhibit -B -Answer and Amended Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified text on 7/27/2021 (eop). (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Fire & Casualty Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James Charles Champlin IV

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas Daryl Martin(Designation Retained)

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jordan A. Weber