This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/13/2023 at 09:41:20 (UTC).

Davis et al v. Safeco Insurance Company of America

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 Davis filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Safeco Insurance Company of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Ronald A. White and Kimberly E. West. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:23-CV-00020

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ronald A. White

Referral Judge

Kimberly E. West

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ronald Davis

Angel Durbin

Defendant

Safeco Insurance Company of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael Burrage

Attorney at Whitten Burrage

512 N Broadway, Ste 300

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Austin Vance

Attorney at Whitten Burrage

512 N Broadway, Ste 300

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

J. Renley Dennis

Attorney at Whitten Burrage

512 N Broadway, Ste 300

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Defendant Attorneys

Jerrick L. Irby

Attorney at Hall Estill Hardwick Gable Golden & Nelson (TUL)

521 East 2Nd Street, Ste 1200

Tulsa, OK 74120

William W. O'Connor

Attorney at Hall Estill Hardwick Gable Golden & Nelson (TUL)

521 East 2Nd Street, Ste 1200

Tulsa, OK 74120

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference for 3/29/2023 at 9:45 AM in Chambers, Room 430, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. The Court will initiate the conference call. Joint Status Report due by March 24, 2023. (tjm, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 3/2/2023 (tjm, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 03/02/2023)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Change of Address by Jerrick L. Irby by on behalf of Safeco Insurance Company of America (Irby, Jerrick) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Change of Address by William W. O'Connor by on behalf of Safeco Insurance Company of America (O'Connor, William) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

#15

(#15) ANSWER to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Safeco Insurance Company of America (Irby, Jerrick) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

#11

(#11) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parents Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, SafeCo Corporation, Liberty Insurance Holdings, Inc., Liberty Mutual Agency Corporation, LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., Liberty Mutual Group Inc. and Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc. for Safeco Insurance Company of America) by Safeco Insurance Company of America (Irby, Jerrick) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

#10

(#10) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by William W. O'Connor on behalf of Safeco Insurance Company of America (O'Connor, William) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

#9

(#12) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West: Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America's Unopposed Motion for First Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint (Docket Entry #9 ) is hereby GRANTED. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond no later than FEBRUARY 2, 2023. (Re: #9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer ) (tjm, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

#8

(#8) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jerrick L. Irby on behalf of Safeco Insurance Company of America (Irby, Jerrick) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

#7

(#7) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Austin Vance on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Vance, Austin) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by J. Renley Dennis on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Dennis, J.) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael Burrage on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Burrage, Michael) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

#3

(#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk- Defendant is directed to pay the $402 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 1/19/2023) (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) (jld, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

2 #4

Exhibit 4-ROS

2 #3

Exhibit 3-Summons

2 #2

Exhibit 2-Petition

2 #1

Exhibit 1-Docket

2 #2

Main Document

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference for 3/29/2023 at 9:45 AM in Chambers, Room 430, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. The Court will initiate the conference call. Joint Status Report due by March 24, 2023. (tjm, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 3/2/2023 (tjm, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 03/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Change of Address by Jerrick L. Irby by on behalf of Safeco Insurance Company of America (Irby, Jerrick) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Change of Address by William W. O'Connor by on behalf of Safeco Insurance Company of America (O'Connor, William) (Entered: 02/08/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • Docket(#16) MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White: The parties are advised that this case has been referred to Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West for all pretrial and discovery matters, including dispositive motions, in accordance with 28 U.S.C., Section 636(b) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72. All future filings shall bear the case number CIV-23-020-RAW-KEW. (tls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/03/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ANSWER to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by Safeco Insurance Company of America (Irby, Jerrick) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • Docket(#14) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk: Pursuant to the recusal of United States District Judge John F. Heil, III and at the direction of the Court, this case is reassigned to United States District Judge Ronald A. White. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-23-20-RAW. (ndd, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/26/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • Docket(#13) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk. Pursuant to receipt of an election of the District Judge Option and in accordance with LCvR 40.1(c), this case is reassigned to District Judge John F. Heil, III. Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West no longer assigned to case. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-23-20-JFH. (tjm, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West: Defendant Safeco Insurance Company of America's Unopposed Motion for First Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint (Docket Entry #9 ) is hereby GRANTED. Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond no later than FEBRUARY 2, 2023. (Re: #9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer ) (tjm, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parents Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, SafeCo Corporation, Liberty Insurance Holdings, Inc., Liberty Mutual Agency Corporation, LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., Liberty Mutual Group Inc. and Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc. for Safeco Insurance Company of America) by Safeco Insurance Company of America (Irby, Jerrick) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by William W. O'Connor on behalf of Safeco Insurance Company of America (O'Connor, William) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jerrick L. Irby on behalf of Safeco Insurance Company of America (Irby, Jerrick) (Entered: 01/19/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Austin Vance on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Vance, Austin) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by J. Renley Dennis on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Dennis, J.) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael Burrage on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Burrage, Michael) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFILING FEES Paid in Full on 1/12/2023 in the amount of $402, receipt number AOKEDC-1746672 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by Safeco Insurance Company of America (Irby, Jerrick) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • Docket(#4) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk- Applicable parties are directed to file Disclosure Statements per FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Disclosure Statement available on the Court's website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires.(jld, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk- Defendant is directed to pay the $402 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 1/19/2023) (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) (jld, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Removal from Muskogee County District Court, case number CJ-2022-321 by Safeco Insurance Company of America (With attachments)(jld, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Safeco Insurance Company of America (jld, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketPETITION with Jury Demand filed in State Court against Safeco Insurance Company of America by Ronald Davis, Angel Durbin (jld, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less