This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/11/2022 at 07:52:59 (UTC).

Davis et al v. Rebel Creamery LLC

Case Summary

On 07/13/2022 Davis filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Rebel Creamery LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas S. Hixson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-04111

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas S. Hixson

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Angela Davis

Bonnie Bennett

Defendant

Rebel Creamery LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Steffan T. Keeton

Attorney at The Keeton Firm LLC

100 S Commons, Suite 102

Pittsburgh, PA 15212

John Ryan Gustafson

Attorney at Good Gustafson Aumais LLP

2330 Westwood Blvd., Suite 103

Los Angeles, CA 90064

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/6/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/13/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (kkp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2022) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

#4

(#4) Proposed Summons. (Keeton, Steffan) (Filed on 7/16/2022) (Entered: 07/16/2022)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Rebel Creamery LLC. (kkp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2022) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

#6

(#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bonnie Bennett, Angela Davis.. (Gustafson, John) (Filed on 7/18/2022) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bonnie Bennett, Angela Davis.. (Gustafson, John) (Filed on 7/18/2022) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Rebel Creamery LLC. (kkp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2022) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Proposed Summons. (Keeton, Steffan) (Filed on 7/16/2022) (Entered: 07/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/6/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/13/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (kkp, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2022) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/28/2022. (jrs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2022) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Rebel Creamery LLC ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17348695.). Filed byAngela Davis, Bonnie Bennett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gustafson, John) (Filed on 7/13/2022) Modified on 7/14/2022 (kkp, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/18/2022 (kkp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less