This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/18/2023 at 01:10:22 (UTC).

Davis et al v. Ford Motor Company

Case Summary

On 10/08/2020 Davis filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability lawsuit against Ford Motor Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Ada Brown. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-03074

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ada Brown

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Becky Davis

LAD

Alan Davis

Defendant

Ford Motor Company

Guardian Ad Litem

Guardian Ad Litem

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew Scott Bullard

Attorney at PayneMitchell Law Group

3500 Maple Ave, Suite 1250

Dallas, TX 75219

James Lee Mitchell

Attorney at Payne Mitchell Law Group

3500 Maple Avenue, Suite 1250

Dallas, TX 75219

Defendant Attorneys

Bradley W Petersen

Attorney at Slattery Petersen PLLC

340 E. Palm Ln., Ste. 250

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Adolfo R Rodriguez, Jr

Attorney at The Rodriguez Firm, P.C.

1700 Pacific Ave, Suite 3850

Dallas, TX 75201

Christopher Kelley Rusek

Attorney at Rodriguez Law Firm, P.C.

1700 Pacific Avenue, Suite 3850

Dallas, TX 75201-6659

Meredith Borschow Gerber

Attorney at Rodriguez Law Firm, P.C.

1700 Pacific Avenue, Suite 3850

Dallas, TX 75201

Guardian Ad Litem Attorney

Carolyn Inez Wright

Attorney at Chief Justice Ret TX State Court of Appeals

154 Shepherds Glen Road, Unit 127

Heath, TX 75032

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM: It is therefore necessary to appoint a new guardian ad litem for minor plaintiff L.A.D. with respect to the settlement of his claim. The Court appoints the following guardian ad litem The Honorable Carolyn Wright (Ret.). (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 6/3/2022) (ndt) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

#17

(#17) ORDER granting #16 Motion to Withdraw as Guardian Ad Litem. The Court will appoint a new guardian ad litem by separate order. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 6/2/2022) (ndt) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

16 #1

Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Withdrawal

#16

(#17) ORDER granting #16 Motion to Withdraw as Guardian Ad Litem. The Court will appoint a new guardian ad litem by separate order. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 6/2/2022) (ndt) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

#15

No Description Available

14 #1

Proposed Order

#14

No Description Available

#13

No Description Available

#12

No Description Available

#11

No Description Available

#10

(#10) Designation of Mediator by Ford Motor Company. (Rodriguez, Adolfo) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2023
  • Docket(#23) ELECTRONIC Notice of Zoom Guardian ad Litem Prove-Up Hearing set for 1/25/2023 at 10:00 AM before Judge Ada Brown. (chmb) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge David L. Horan assigned to this case pursuant to Special Order 3-346 for matters that may be referred. (cea) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • Docket(#22) ELECTRONIC Notice - Zoom Guardian ad Litem Prove-Up Hearing set for 12/14/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge Ada Brown is cancelled and will be reset at a future date. (chmb) (Entered: 12/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • Docket(#21) ELECTRONIC Notice of Hearing - Zoom Guardian ad Litem Prove-Up Hearing reset for 12/14/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge Ada Brown. (chmb) (Entered: 12/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2022
  • Docket(#20) ELECTRONIC Notice of Hearing - Zoom Guardian ad Litem Prove-Up Hearing set for 12/12/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Ada Brown. (chmb) (Entered: 12/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • Docket***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:18,19. Fri Jun 3 12:54:51 CDT 2022 (crt) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • Docket***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:17. Fri Jun 3 12:25:58 CDT 2022 (crt) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • Docket(#19) ELECTRONIC ORDER: The parties have informed the Court that they have reached a settlement agreement as to all claims in this action. Accordingly, the Court vacates the trial setting and cancels the pretrial conference. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 6/3/2022) (chmb) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN AD LITEM: It is therefore necessary to appoint a new guardian ad litem for minor plaintiff L.A.D. with respect to the settlement of his claim. The Court appoints the following guardian ad litem The Honorable Carolyn Wright (Ret.). (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 6/3/2022) (ndt) (Entered: 06/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER granting #16 Motion to Withdraw as Guardian Ad Litem. The Court will appoint a new guardian ad litem by separate order. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 6/2/2022) (ndt) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Designation of Mediator by Ford Motor Company. (Rodriguez, Adolfo) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for three-week docket beginning 6/7/2022 before Judge Ada Brown. Joinder of Parties due by 6/18/2021. Amended Pleadings due by 6/18/2021. Motions due by 3/4/2022. Discovery due by 2/11/2022. Pretrial Order due by 5/6/2022. Pretrial Materials due by 5/6/2022. Pretrial Conference set for 6/6/2022 10:00 AM before Judge Ada Brown. Deadline for mediation is on or before 2/11/2022. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 11/30/2020) (chmb) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Ford Motor Company. (Rodriguez, Adolfo) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report Due Three (3) Weeks from the Date of this Order. (Ordered by Judge Ada Brown on 11/4/2020) (axm) (Entered: 11/04/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Ford Motor Company. (Rodriguez, Adolfo) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Ford Motor Company. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Adolfo R Rodriguez, Jr added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft) (Rodriguez, Adolfo) (Entered: 11/03/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Ford Motor Company. (jmg) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (jmg) (Entered: 10/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Becky Davis. (Mitchell, James) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Ford Motor Company filed by Becky Davis. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-11248713) Clerk to issue summons(es). In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s)) (Mitchell, James) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LAD-P LLC DBA PORSCHE OF DOWNTOWN LA is a litigant

Latest cases where Ford Motor Company is a litigant