This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/16/2021 at 10:49:58 (UTC).

Davies v. Bank of America Corporation

Case Summary

On 12/18/2020 Davies filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against Bank of America Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sidney A Fitzwater. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-03674

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sidney A Fitzwater

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Daniel Davies

Sunnyvale, TX 75182

Defendant

Bank of America Corporation doing business as Bank of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Morgan Thornton

Attorney at Stewart Law Group PLLC

1722 Routh Street, Suite 745

Dallas, TX 75201

Melanie Elizabeth Osborn

Attorney at Rubin Fortunato & Harbison PC

10 South Leopard Road

Paoli, PA 19301

Andrew Michael DeLucia

Attorney at Rubin Fortunato & Harbison PC

10 South Leopard Road

Paoli, PA 19301

Amy M Stewart

Attorney at Stewart Law Group PLLC

1722 Routh Street, Suite 745

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order Joint Submission by Bank of America Corporation. (Stewart, Amy) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

15 #1

Additional Page(s) Certificate of Good Standing

#15

(#15) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11592056) filed by Bank of America Corporation (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) Certificate of Good Standing)Attorney Andrew Michael DeLucia added to party Bank of America Corporation(pty:dft) (DeLucia, Andrew) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

13 #1

Additional Page(s) Certificate of Good Standing

#13

(#13) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11560702) filed by Bank of America Corporation (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) Certificate of Good Standing)Attorney Melanie Elizabeth Osborn added to party Bank of America Corporation(pty:dft) (Osborn, Melanie) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

#12

(#12) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bank of America Corporation. (Stewart, Amy) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

#11

(#11) Order for Scheduling Order Proposal: Proposed Scheduling Order due by 2/16/2021. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 1/19/2021) (axm) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to #3 Complaint mfiled by Bank of America Corporation. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Amy M Stewart added to party Bank of America Corporation(pty:dft) (Stewart, Amy) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Reinstatement/Address of Unlawful Termination to Seek a Solution filed by Daniel Davies. (mjr) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Bank of America, NA; served on 12/22/2020. (jmg) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Bank of America Corporation. (hml) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

#5

(#5) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Daniel Davies. (hml) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Daniel Davies. (hml) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

#3

(#3) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Bank of America Corporation filed by Daniel Davies. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number DS128476) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (hml) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

#2

(#2) Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (hml) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

#1

(#1) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Proposal for contents of scheduling and discovery order Joint Submission by Bank of America Corporation. (Stewart, Amy) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #15 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Andrew M. DeLucia. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 2/9/2021) (Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11592056) filed by Bank of America Corporation (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) Certificate of Good Standing)Attorney Andrew Michael DeLucia added to party Bank of America Corporation(pty:dft) (DeLucia, Andrew) (Entered: 02/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #13 Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Melanie E. Osborn. Important Reminder: Unless excused for cause, an attorney who is not an ECF user must register within 14 days of the date the attorney appears in a case pursuant to LR 5.1(f) and LCrR 49.2(g). (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 1/29/2021) (Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice with Certificate of Good Standing (Filing fee $100; Receipt number 0539-11560702) filed by Bank of America Corporation (Attachments: #1 Additional Page(s) Certificate of Good Standing)Attorney Melanie Elizabeth Osborn added to party Bank of America Corporation(pty:dft) (Osborn, Melanie) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bank of America Corporation. (Stewart, Amy) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Order for Scheduling Order Proposal: Proposed Scheduling Order due by 2/16/2021. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sidney A Fitzwater on 1/19/2021) (axm) (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #3 Complaint mfiled by Bank of America Corporation. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. Attorney Amy M Stewart added to party Bank of America Corporation(pty:dft) (Stewart, Amy) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) (AMENDED) Civil Cover Sheet to #3 Complaint, by Plaintiff Daniel Davies. (mjr) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Reinstatement/Address of Unlawful Termination to Seek a Solution filed by Daniel Davies. (mjr) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Bank of America, NA; served on 12/22/2020. (jmg) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to Bank of America Corporation. (hml) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Daniel Davies. (hml) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Daniel Davies. (hml) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Bank of America Corporation filed by Daniel Davies. (Filing fee $402; Receipt number DS128476) Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (hml) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party. (hml) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Case received over counter/electronically. No prior sanctions found. (For court use only - links to the #national and #circuit indexes.) Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Horan). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (hml) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ANDREW MICHAEL DELUCIA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amy Marie Stewart