This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/02/2023 at 08:30:44 (UTC).

Davide et al v. Marriott International, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/03/2022 Davide filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Marriott International, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Ellen Lipton Hollander. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-02851

  • Filing Date:

    11/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ellen Lipton Hollander

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Zoe Davide

Madison Howard

Alana Nelson

Defendant

Marriott International, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew Scott Parmet

Attorney at Parmet PC

3 Riverway, Ste. 1910

Houston, TX 77056

Kimberly De Arcangelis

Attorney at Morgan & Morga, P.A.

20 N. Orange Avenue, 14Th Floor

Orlando, FL 32801

Defendant Attorney

Lincoln Owens Bisbee

Attorney at Morgan Lewis and Bockius LLP

101 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10178

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons

2 #2

Main Document

2 #1

Exhibit 1 - Consent

2 #2

Exhibit 2 - Consent

2 #3

Exhibit 3 - Consent

3 #3

Main Document

3 #1

Exhibit Courts of Admission

#4

(#4) Summons Issued 21 days as to Marriott International, Inc..(mg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Lincoln Owens Bisbee on behalf of Marriott International, Inc. (Bisbee, Lincoln) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time by Marriott International, Inc.(Bisbee, Lincoln) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by District Judge Ellen Lipton Hollander on 12/22/2022. (cs3s, Clerk) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by District Judge Ellen Lipton Hollander on 12/22/2022. (cs3s, Clerk) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Extension of Time by Marriott International, Inc.(Bisbee, Lincoln) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Lincoln Owens Bisbee on behalf of Marriott International, Inc. (Bisbee, Lincoln) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Kimberly De Arcangelis. Directing attorney Kimberly De Arcangelis to register for pro hac vice filing in the District of Maryland through PACER at https://pacer.uscourts.gov/ if attorney has not already done so. The Pro Hac Vice option must be selected when registering. Signed by Clerk on 11/7/2022. (mh4s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued 21 days as to Marriott International, Inc..(mg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Kimberly De Arcangelis (Filing fee $100, receipt number AMDDC-10254822.) by Zoe Davide (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Courts of Admission)(Parmet, Matthew) (Entered: 11/04/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE by Zoe Davide of Filing Consent (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Consent, #2 Exhibit 2 - Consent, #3 Exhibit 3 - Consent)(Parmet, Matthew) (Entered: 11/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Marriott International, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10252549.), filed by Zoe Davide. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Parmet, Matthew) (Entered: 11/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Marriott International Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lincoln Owens Bisbee