This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/24/2020 at 07:35:28 (UTC).

David Weisberg v. Coconut Funding, LLC

Case Summary

On 03/25/2020 David Weisberg filed an Other lawsuit against Coconut Funding, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Maria A. Audero and Percy Anderson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02778

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Maria A. Audero

Presiding Judge

Percy Anderson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David Weisberg

Defendant

Coconut Funding, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Seyed Abbas Kazerounian

Attorney at Kazerouni Law Group APC

245 Fischer Avenue Unit D1

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Yana A Hart

Attorney at Kazerouni Law Group APC

2221 Camino Del Rio South Suite 101

San Diego, CA 92108

Todd M Friedman

Attorney at Law Office of Todd M Friedman PC

21550 Oxnard Street Suite 780

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

Defendant Attorney

June D Coleman

Attorney at Messer Strickler Ltd

5960 South Land Park Drive Suite 1059

Sacramento, CA 95822

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) ORDER GRANTING IN PART REQUEST TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT (L.R. 8-3) #15 by Judge Percy Anderson. IT IS SO ORDERED that Defendant's response to the Complaint will be due on June 2, 2020. (lom) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

15 #1

Proposed Order

#14

(#14) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Todd M Friedman counsel for Plaintiff David Weisberg. Adding Todd M. Friedman as counsel of record for David Weisberg for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff David Weisberg. (Attorney Todd M Friedman added to party David Weisberg(pty:pla))(Friedman, Todd) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

#13

(#13) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less), #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Caption of document is incomplete/incorrect. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

#12

(#12) First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Coconut Funding, LLC answer now due 5/18/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant Coconut Funding, LLC.(Attorney June D Coleman added to party Coconut Funding, LLC(pty:dft))(Coleman, June) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

#11

(#11) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal For Lack Of Prosecution by Judge Percy Anderson. (Show Cause Response due by 5/11/2020.) (mrgo) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

#10

(#10) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

9 #1

Certificate of Service

#8

(#8) STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (See document for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Coconut Funding, LLC. (esa) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (esa) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff David Weisberg. (Kazerounian, Seyed) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

#3

(#3) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff David Weisberg, (Kazerounian, Seyed) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff David Weisberg. (Kazerounian, Seyed) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-25858571 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff David Weisberg. (Attorney Seyed Abbas Kazerounian added to party David Weisberg(pty:pla))(Kazerounian, Seyed) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER GRANTING IN PART REQUEST TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT (L.R. 8-3) #15 by Judge Percy Anderson. IT IS SO ORDERED that Defendant's response to the Complaint will be due on June 2, 2020. (lom) (Entered: 05/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to June 19, 2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant Coconut Funding, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Coleman, June) (Entered: 05/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Todd M Friedman counsel for Plaintiff David Weisberg. Adding Todd M. Friedman as counsel of record for David Weisberg for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff David Weisberg. (Attorney Todd M Friedman added to party David Weisberg(pty:pla))(Friedman, Todd) (Entered: 05/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less), #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Caption of document is incomplete/incorrect. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo) (Entered: 05/01/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Coconut Funding, LLC answer now due 5/18/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by defendant Coconut Funding, LLC.(Attorney June D Coleman added to party Coconut Funding, LLC(pty:dft))(Coleman, June) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal For Lack Of Prosecution by Judge Percy Anderson. (Show Cause Response due by 5/11/2020.) (mrgo) (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Case number is incorrect or missing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo) (Entered: 04/08/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff David Weisberg, upon Defendant Coconut Funding, LLC served on 4/6/2020, answer due 4/27/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corp., Agent for Service, Peter Cayetano, Authorize Person in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hart, Yana) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (See document for details) (mrgo) (Entered: 03/27/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Coconut Funding, LLC. (esa) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (esa) (Entered: 03/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff David Weisberg. (Kazerounian, Seyed) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff David Weisberg, (Kazerounian, Seyed) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff David Weisberg. (Kazerounian, Seyed) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-25858571 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff David Weisberg. (Attorney Seyed Abbas Kazerounian added to party David Weisberg(pty:pla))(Kazerounian, Seyed) (Entered: 03/25/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COCONUT FUNDING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Seyed Abbas Kazerounian

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Yana A. Hart

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Todd M Friedman