This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/21/2021 at 09:47:46 (UTC).

David v. ISLAND TIME WATERSPORTS (CARIBBEAN), LLC D/B/A CRUZ BAY WATERSPORTS et al

Case Summary

On 03/22/2021 David filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against ISLAND TIME WATERSPORTS CARIBBEAN , LLC D/B/A CRUZ BAY WATERSPORTS. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virgin Islands District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Ruth Miller and Robert A. Molloy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00027

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Ruth Miller

Presiding Judge

Robert A. Molloy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Maximus David

St. Thomas, VI 00803

Defendants

ISLAND TIME WATERSPORTS (CARIBBEAN), LLC D/B/A CRUZ BAY WATERSPORTS

4608 Tutu Park Mall, Marchants Financial Center, Suite 202

St. Thomas, VI 00802

TROY NEIL

St. Thomas, VI 00802

Christopher J Batchelor

St. Thomas, VI 00802

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PETER JAMES LYNCH

Attorney at Fuller & Lynch Advocacy Group, PLLC

Po Box 303300

St. Thomas, VI 00803

Defendant Attorney

Adam Nicholas Marinelli

Attorney at Bolt Nagi PC

Merchant Financial Center 4608 Tutu Park Mall Suite 202

St. Thomas, VI 00802-1735

 

Court Documents

#19

RESTRICTED

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

12 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#12

11 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Remand

#11

10 #3

Exhibit C

10 #2

Exhibit B

10 #1

Exhibit A

#10

#9

7 #1

Exhibit A - Email Payment Confirmations

#7

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller: Teams Video Conference Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/29/2021. (TRH) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) TRIAL MANAGEMENT ORDER (RM): Status Conference set for July 29, 2021 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. Trial set for May 16, 2022 at 09:00 AM in STT Courtroom 1 before Judge Robert A. Molloy. (AO) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) DISCOVERY MEMORANDUM-Rule 16 by Plaintiff Maximus David. (LYNCH, PETER) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) STIPULATION Joint Proposed Scheduling Plan by Christopher J Batchelor, ISLAND TIME WATERSPORTS (CARIBBEAN), LLC D/B/A CRUZ BAY WATERSPORTS, TROY NEIL. (Marinelli, Adam) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Service of Plaintiff's Initial Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures by Maximus David (LYNCH, PETER) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) DISCOVERY MEMORANDUM-Rule 16 by Defendants Christopher J Batchelor, ISLAND TIME WATERSPORTS (CARIBBEAN), LLC D/B/A CRUZ BAY WATERSPORTS, TROY NEIL. (Marinelli, Adam) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Service of Defendants Initial Rule 26 Disclosures by Christopher J Batchelor, ISLAND TIME WATERSPORTS (CARIBBEAN), LLC D/B/A CRUZ BAY WATERSPORTS, TROY NEIL (Marinelli, Adam) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Opposition to Motion re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Defendants Christopher J Batchelor, ISLAND TIME WATERSPORTS (CARIBBEAN), LLC D/B/A CRUZ BAY WATERSPORTS, TROY NEIL. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Marinelli, Adam) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Maximus David. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order to Remand) (LYNCH, PETER) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Filing by Maximus David (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (LYNCH, PETER) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER (RM) granting #7 Motion for Release of Funds. The Clerk of Court shall issue a refund in the amount of Four Hundred and Two Dollars to counsel for defendants, BoltNagi PC. (AO) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER (RM) setting Rule 16 Conference before U.S. Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (COUNSEL ARE DIRECTED TO REVIEW THE ORDER IN DETAIL AND COMPLY WITH ALL REQUIREMENTS.) (AO) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Release of Funds From Court Registry by Defendants Christopher J Batchelor, ISLAND TIME WATERSPORTS (CARIBBEAN), LLC D/B/A CRUZ BAY WATERSPORTS, TROY NEIL. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email Payment Confirmations, #2 Text of Proposed Order of Motion to Release Funds From Court Registry) (Marinelli, Adam) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Christopher J Batchelor, ISLAND TIME WATERSPORTS (CARIBBEAN), LLC D/B/A CRUZ BAY WATERSPORTS, TROY NEIL. (Marinelli, Adam) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER (RM) granting (12) Motion in case 3:20-cv-00125-RAM-RM; granting (8) Motion in case 3:20-cv-00126-RAM-RM; granting (3) Motion in case 3:21-cv-00027-RAM-RM Associated Cases: 3:21-cv-00027-RAM-RM, 3:20-cv-00125-RAM-RM, 3:20-cv-00126-RAM-RM (TRH) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Filing Civil Cover Sheet by Christopher J Batchelor, ISLAND TIME WATERSPORTS (CARIBBEAN), LLC D/B/A CRUZ BAY WATERSPORTS, TROY NEIL re (1 in 3:21-cv-00027-RAM-RM, 10 in 3:20-cv-00125-RAM-RM, 6 in 3:20-cv-00126-RAM-RM) Notice of Removal,, (7 in 3:20-cv-00126-RAM-RM, 11 in 3:20-cv-00125-RAM-RM, 2 in 3:21-cv-00027-RAM-RM) Notice of Corrected Docket Entry, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) Associated Cases: 3:21-cv-00027-RAM-RM, 3:20-cv-00125-RAM-RM, 3:20-cv-00126-RAM-RM (Marinelli, Adam) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MOTION to Remove Related Cases re (1 in 3:21-cv-00027-RAM-RM, 10 in 3:20-cv-00125-RAM-RM, 6 in 3:20-cv-00126-RAM-RM) Notice of Removal,, by Defendants Christopher J Batchelor, ISLAND TIME WATERSPORTS (CARIBBEAN), LLC D/B/A CRUZ BAY WATERSPORTS, TROY NEIL. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) Associated Cases: 3:21-cv-00027-RAM-RM, 3:20-cv-00125-RAM-RM, 3:20-cv-00126-RAM-RM (Marinelli, Adam) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF CORRECTED DOCKET ENTRY: Filer is advised to file a civil cover sheet pursuant to LCRi 3.1. When filing the civil cover sheet use the event Notice of Filing with the civil cover sheet as an attachment to the notice and to link the document to the complaint. Re: (10 in 3:20-cv-00125-RAM-RM, 1 in 3:21-cv-00027-RAM-RM, 6 in 3:20-cv-00126-RAM-RM) Notice of Removal,,. Associated Cases: 3:21-cv-00027-RAM-RM, 3:20-cv-00125-RAM-RM, 3:20-cv-00126-RAM-RM (KW) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Plaintiff Maximus David from Superior Court of the Virgin Islands, St. Thomas Division, case number ST-2020-CV-00443. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number VIDC-923167)filed by ISLAND TIME WATERSPORTS (CARIBBEAN), LLC D/B/A CRUZ BAY WATERSPORTS, TROY NEIL, Christopher J Batchelor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Verified Complaint in Superior Court Case ST-2020-CV-00443) Associated Cases: 3:21-cv-00027, 3:20-cv-00125-RAM-RM, 3:20-cv-00126-RAM-RM (Marinelli, Adam) (Entered: 03/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less