Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 11/17/2020 at 09:38:51 (UTC).

David v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/18/2020 David filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Shelly D. Dick and Scott D. Johnson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00624

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Shelly D. Dick

Referral Judge

Scott D. Johnson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Laura Ann David

Defendants

Chattem, Inc.

Sanofi US Services Inc.

GlaxoSmithKline, LLC

Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Pfizer, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew Palmer Lambert

Attorney at Gainsburgh Benjamin David Meunier & Warshauer

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 2800

New Orleans, LA 70163

Claire Elizabeth Berg

1445 Philip Street

New Orleans, LA 70130

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) Return on Electronic Transfer from Southern District of Florida. (EDC) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

#7

(#7) Extraction Log of a case Transferred to Southern District of Florida. (EDC) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

#6

(#6) GENERAL ORDER: All pleadings and other papers filed under seal in civil and criminal actions shall be maintained under seal for thirty days following final disposition of the action. After that time, all sealed pleadings and other papers shall be placed in the case record unless a District Judge or Magistrate Judge, upon motion and for good cause shown, orders that the pleading or other paper be maintained under seal. The deadline for filing any motions regarding the unsealing of any document shall be within thirty days of the final disposition of any action and shall contain a concise statement of reasons for maintaining the pleading or other paper under seal. ATTENTION: If a motion to retain documents under seal is NOT filed, all documents shall be placed in the public case record, unless specifically identified in the attached General Order Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/8/2019. (EDC) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

5 #1

Conditional Transfer Order

#5

(#5) Order Transferring Case to JPML Court. (Attachments: #1 Conditional Transfer Order)(EDC) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

4 #1

Minute Order

#4

(#4) Initial Conditional Transfer Order from the JPML Panel. (Attachments: #1 Minute Order) (EDC) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

#3

(#3) Letter to JPML Panel notifying panel of possible JPML case (SWE) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Chattem, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline, LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc.. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (SWE) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

1 #6

Attachment Summons

1 #5

Attachment Summons

1 #4

Attachment Summons

1 #3

Attachment Summons

1 #1

Attachment Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2173947.), filed by Laura Ann David. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Summons, #3 Attachment Summons, #4 Attachment Summons, #5 Attachment Summons, #6 Attachment Summons)(Lambert, Matthew) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Return on Electronic Transfer from Southern District of Florida. (EDC) (Entered: 10/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Extraction Log of a case Transferred to Southern District of Florida. (EDC) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) GENERAL ORDER: All pleadings and other papers filed under seal in civil and criminal actions shall be maintained under seal for thirty days following final disposition of the action. After that time, all sealed pleadings and other papers shall be placed in the case record unless a District Judge or Magistrate Judge, upon motion and for good cause shown, orders that the pleading or other paper be maintained under seal. The deadline for filing any motions regarding the unsealing of any document shall be within thirty days of the final disposition of any action and shall contain a concise statement of reasons for maintaining the pleading or other paper under seal. ATTENTION: If a motion to retain documents under seal is NOT filed, all documents shall be placed in the public case record, unless specifically identified in the attached General Order Signed by Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick on 7/8/2019. (EDC) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Order Transferring Case to JPML Court. (Attachments: #1 Conditional Transfer Order)(EDC) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Initial Conditional Transfer Order from the JPML Panel. (Attachments: #1 Minute Order) (EDC) (Entered: 10/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Letter to JPML Panel notifying panel of possible JPML case (SWE) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Chattem, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline, LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc.. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (SWE) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-2173947.), filed by Laura Ann David. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment Summons, #3 Attachment Summons, #4 Attachment Summons, #5 Attachment Summons, #6 Attachment Summons)(Lambert, Matthew) (Entered: 09/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chattem Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Sanofi US Services Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where GlaxoSmithKline LLC is a litigant