This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/10/2021 at 09:14:46 (UTC).

David Brent Adams et al v. City of Costa Mesa et al

Case Summary

On 06/11/2021 David Brent Adams filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against City of Costa Mesa. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Douglas F. McCormick and David O. Carter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-01030

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Douglas F. McCormick

Presiding Judge

David O. Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

David Brent Adams

Enclave Assets LLC

Defendants

Raymond Pascua

DOES 1-10 Inclusive

City of Costa Mesa

Michelle Halligan

Ryan Bohr

Winston Karuga

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Frank A Weiser

Attorney at Law Offices of Frank Weiser

3460 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1212

Los Angeles, CA 90010

Defendant Attorneys

Brooke A. Buchanan

Attorney at Jones and Mayer

3777 North Harbor Boulevard

Fullerton, CA 92835

James R Touchstone

Attorney at Jones and Mayer

3777 North Harbor Boulevard

Fullerton, CA 92835

Melissa Miles Ballard

Attorney at Jones and Mayer

3777 North Harbor Boulevard

Fullerton, CA 92835

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

9 #9

Main Document

9 #1

Proposed Order

#10

#11

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 8/30/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (kd) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant City of Costa Mesa, (Ballard, Melissa) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant City of Costa Mesa. Motion set for hearing on 8/30/2021 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Melissa Miles Ballard added to party City of Costa Mesa(pty:dft)) (Ballard, Melissa) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant City of Costa Mesa. (twdb) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs David Brent Adams, Enclave Assets LLC. (Weiser, Frank) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (jtil) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs David Brent Adams, Enclave Assets LLC. (Weiser, Frank) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs David Brent Adams, Enclave Assets LLC, identifying Plaintiff David Brent Adams, Plaintiff Enclave Assets LLC, Defendant City of Costa Mesa, a municipal corporation, Defendant Winston Karuga, Defendant Ryan Bohr, Defendant Raymond Pascua, Defendant Michelle Halligan. (Weiser, Frank) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31453300 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiffs Enclave Assets LLC, David Brent Adams. (Attorney Frank A Weiser added to party David Brent Adams(pty:pla), Attorney Frank A Weiser added to party Enclave Assets LLC(pty:pla))(Weiser, Frank) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Enclave Assets, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James R Touchstone

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Melissa Miles Ballard