This case was last updated from PACER on 01/17/2020 at 07:10:25 (UTC).

Davalos v. Focial Point, LLC

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 Davalos filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against Focial Point, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Charles R. Norgle, Sr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-07617

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charles R. Norgle, Sr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Heather Davalos

Defendant

FOCIAL POINT, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Denise M. Clark

Attorney at Clark Law Group, PLLC

1100 Connecticut Ave., N.W., Suite 920

Washington, DC 20036

Defendant Attorneys

Danielle M. Kays

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

233 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 8000

Chicago, IL 60606-6448

Richard Patrick McArdle

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

233 South Wacker Drive, Suite 8000

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Defendant's Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead #4 is granted. The parties are not required to appear before the court on Friday, January 20, 2020. Mailed notice (ewf,) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Motion by Danielle M. Kays for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #4 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 1/3/2020 at 09:30 AM. (Kays, Danielle) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#5

(#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Focial Point, LLC by Richard Patrick McArdle (McArdle, Richard) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#4

(#4) MOTION by Defendant Focial Point, LLC for extension of time to file answer Defendant's Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead (Kays, Danielle) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Focial Point, LLC by Danielle M. Kays (Kays, Danielle) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Heather Davalos as to Focial Point, LLC on 12/3/2019, answer due 12/24/2019. (Clark, Denise) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Heather Davalos; Yes. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16451961. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Clark, Denise) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles R. Norgle: Defendant's Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead #4 is granted. The parties are not required to appear before the court on Friday, January 20, 2020. Mailed notice (ewf,) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Motion by Danielle M. Kays for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer #4 before Honorable Charles R. Norgle Sr. on 1/3/2020 at 09:30 AM. (Kays, Danielle) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Focial Point, LLC by Richard Patrick McArdle (McArdle, Richard) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION by Defendant Focial Point, LLC for extension of time to file answer Defendant's Agreed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead (Kays, Danielle) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Focial Point, LLC by Danielle M. Kays (Kays, Danielle) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Heather Davalos as to Focial Point, LLC on 12/3/2019, answer due 12/24/2019. (Clark, Denise) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • SUMMONS Issued as to Defendant FOCIAL POINT, LLC (txl, ) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Charles R. Norgle, Sr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (txl, ) (Entered: 11/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Heather Davalos; Yes. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16451961. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Clark, Denise) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less