This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 07:23:30 (UTC).

DAUGHERTY v. ORANGE LAKE COUNTRY CLUB INC

Case Summary

On 03/28/2019 DAUGHERTY filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against ORANGE LAKE COUNTRY CLUB INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are M CASEY RODGERS and MICHAEL J FRANK. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00085

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

M CASEY RODGERS

Referral Judge

MICHAEL J FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Allen Monroe Daugherty

Defendants

Orange Lake Country Club, Inc.

ORANGE LAKE COUNTRY CLUB INC

ORANGE LAKE COUNTRY CLUB INC doing business as ORANGE LAK RESORTS doing business as ORANGE LAKE CAPITAL MANAGEMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERT MANNING BALDWIN

Attorney at DC CAPITAL LAW FIRM LLP - WASHINGTON DC

700 12Th Street Nw, Suite 700

Washington, DC 20005

Defendant Attorney

JEFFREY AARON BACKMAN

Attorney at GREENSPOON MARDER PA - FORT LAUDERDALE FL

200 E Broward Blvd, 15Th Fl

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ALLEN MONROE DAUGHERTY (BALDWIN, ROBERT) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

#11

(#11) ACKNOWLEDGMENT re 10 Case Transferred Out to Another District. Case transferred from Florida Northern has been opened in Middle District of Florida as case 6:19cv976, filed 05/24/2019. (MB) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #8 STIPULATION to Transfer Action to the Middle District of Florida by ORANGE LAKE COUNTRY CLUB INC. Accordingly, this action will be transferred to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida. The Clerk is directed to take the necessary steps to effectuate the transfer and close the file. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/23/2019. (MB) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

#8

(#8) STIPULATION to Transfer Action to the Middle District of Florida by ORANGE LAKE COUNTRY CLUB INC. (BACKMAN, JEFFREY) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

#7

(#7) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/1/2019. Discovery due by 11/18/2019. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/17/2019. (sdw) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by ORANGE LAKE COUNTRY CLUB INC. (BACKMAN, JEFFREY) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

5 #1

Exhibit A

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by ORANGE LAKE COUNTRY CLUB INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (BACKMAN, JEFFREY) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#4

(#4) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by ORANGE LAKE COUNTRY CLUB INC. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 5/31/2019). (BACKMAN, JEFFREY) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to ORANGE LAKE COUNTRY CLUB INC. (djb) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Proposed Summons

1 #1

Exhibit Exhibits

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Orange Lake Country Club, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4442431.), filed by Allen Monroe Daugherty. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (BALDWIN, ROBERT) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT Re #12 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal filed by ALLEN MONROE DAUGHERTY, #11 Acknowledgment re 10 Case Transferred Out to Another District. Case transferred from Florida Northern has been opened in Middle District of Florida as case 6:19cv976, filed 05/24/2019. (Please file any future documents regarding this matter in the proper Court - MIDDLE DISTRICT OF FLORIDA, as listed above due to TRANSFER). (MB) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ALLEN MONROE DAUGHERTY (BALDWIN, ROBERT) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ACKNOWLEDGMENT re 10 Case Transferred Out to Another District. Case transferred from Florida Northern has been opened in Middle District of Florida as case 6:19cv976, filed 05/24/2019. (MB) (Entered: 05/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • (#10) Interdistrict Transfer to the MIDDLE DISTRICT OF FLORIDA ORLANDO DIVISION located at US COURTHOUSE, 401 WEST CENTRAL BOULEVARD, SUITE 1200, ORLANDO, FL 32801-0120. (MB) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #8 STIPULATION to Transfer Action to the Middle District of Florida by ORANGE LAKE COUNTRY CLUB INC. Accordingly, this action will be transferred to the United States District Court for the Middle District of Florida. The Clerk is directed to take the necessary steps to effectuate the transfer and close the file. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/23/2019. (MB) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #8 Stipulation to Transfer Action to the Middle District of Florida by ORANGE LAKE COUNTRY CLUB INC. (MB) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STIPULATION to Transfer Action to the Middle District of Florida by ORANGE LAKE COUNTRY CLUB INC. (BACKMAN, JEFFREY) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 7/1/2019. Discovery due by 11/18/2019. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 5/17/2019. (sdw) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #4 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint. (please see proposed ISO) (sdw) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons by ORANGE LAKE COUNTRY CLUB INC. (BACKMAN, JEFFREY) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AFFIDAVIT in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by ORANGE LAKE COUNTRY CLUB INC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (BACKMAN, JEFFREY) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by ORANGE LAKE COUNTRY CLUB INC. (Internal deadline for referral to judge if response not filed earlier: 5/31/2019). (BACKMAN, JEFFREY) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to ORANGE LAKE COUNTRY CLUB INC. (djb) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: NOTICE to Filer - The parties were added to the docket incorrectly and will be corrected by the clerk. For future reference all party names (including aliases, corporate parents, etc.) are to be added using all caps and no punctuation. (See "Style Guide for Electronic Case Filing," available on Clerk's website.) Re #1 Complaint, filed by Allen Monroe Daugherty (djb) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Orange Lake Country Club, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4442431.), filed by Allen Monroe Daugherty. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (BALDWIN, ROBERT) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less