This case was last updated from PACER on 09/07/2021 at 07:47:19 (UTC).

Daubenmire v. Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 Daubenmire filed a Property - Land lawsuit against Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Algenon L. Marbley and Elizabeth Preston Deavers. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-03910

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Land

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Algenon L. Marbley

Referral Judge

Elizabeth Preston Deavers

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Georganne K. Daubenmire

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

John Michael Snider

Attorney at Stebelton Snider, LPA

Po Box 130

Lancaster, OH 43130-0130

Jefferson Mitchell Kiser

Attorney at Stebelton Snider LPA

109 N. Broad Street, Suite 200

Lancaster, OH 43130

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Christopher Andrew Rogers

Attorney at Benesch, Friedlander, Coplan & Aronoff

200 Public Square, Suite 2300

Cleveland, OH 44114

Michael L Snyder

Attorney at Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff LLP

Suite 2300, 200 Public Square

Cleveland, OH 44114-2563

Jerome W. Cook

Attorney at Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff LLP

200 Public Square, Suite 2300

Cleveland, OH 44114

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ORDER - The Court DEFERS setting a case scheduling order until after a ruling on the Motion for Order of Condemnation. (ECF No. 14.) The Court will schedule a conference and direct the filing of an amended Rule 26(f) Report, as necessary, at that time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on August 25, 2021. (jlk) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

14 #9

Text of Proposed Order

14 #8

Exhibit F to Declaration

14 #7

Exhibit E to Declaration

14 #6

Exhibit D to Declaration

14 #5

Exhibit C to Declaration

14 #4

Exhibit B to Declaration

14 #3

Exhibit A to Declaration

14 #2

Declaration

14 #1

Memorandum in Support

14 #14

Main Document

12 #2

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

12 #1

Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing

12 #12

Main Document

#10

(#10) RULE 26(f) REPORT by Counter Claimant Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC, Defendant Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Cook, Jerome) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

7 #7

Exhibit 7

7 #6

Exhibit 6

7 #3

Exhibit 3

24 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER - The Court DEFERS setting a case scheduling order until after a ruling on the Motion for Order of Condemnation. (ECF No. 14.) The Court will schedule a conference and direct the filing of an amended Rule 26(f) Report, as necessary, at that time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on August 25, 2021. (jlk) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION Order of Condemnation by Counter Claimant Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC, Defendant Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration, #5 Exhibit C to Declaration, #6 Exhibit D to Declaration, #7 Exhibit E to Declaration, #8 Exhibit F to Declaration, #9 Text of Proposed Order) (Cook, Jerome) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Christopher A. Rogers as co-counsel. Co-Counsel is directed to register for e-filing through PACER unless they have done so previously. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on August 18, 2021. (jlk) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number AOHSDC-8452351) of Christopher A. Rogers by Counter Claimant Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC, Defendant Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Cook, Jerome) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE: The Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for August 17, 2021 at 10:00 a.m.before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Preston Deavers is VACATED. (jv) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RULE 26(f) REPORT by Counter Claimant Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC, Defendant Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Cook, Jerome) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #7 Answer to Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM, filed by Georganne K. Daubenmire. (Kiser, Jefferson) Modified on 8/9/2021 (jlk). (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF CONDEMNATION Counterclaim, filed by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Cook, Jerome) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #4 Complaint , and COUNTERCLAIM against Georganne K. Daubenmire filed by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9) (Cook, Jerome) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/17/2021 @ 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. The parties are directed to call 1-877-336-1280, enter access code 7598806#, followed by security code 1234#. (sh) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael L Snyder for Defendant Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC (Snyder, Michael) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COMPLAINT against Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC, filed by Georganne K. Daubenmire. (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Cook, Jerome) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Jerome W. Cook for Defendant Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC (Cook, Jerome) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas of Fairfield County, case number 21-cv-00261 ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8395879), filed by Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Complaint, #2 Exhibit B: Praecipe for Service, #3 Exhibit C: Clerks Certificate of Certified Mail, #4 Exhibit D: Summons, #5 Exhibit E: Proof of Service, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Cook, Jerome) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Columbia Gas Transmission, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher A Rogers

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jerome W. Cook

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael L Snyder