This case was last updated from PACER on 09/15/2020 at 09:38:33 (UTC).

Datrec v. MyHeritage USA Inc et al

Case Summary

On 07/17/2020 Datrec filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against MyHeritage USA Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dustin B. Pead and Dee Benson. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00514

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Utah District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Dustin B. Pead

Dee Benson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Datrec

Defendants

MyHeritage Ltd

MyHeritage USA Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Craig A. Buschmann

Attorney at RAMEY & SCHWALLER LLP

5020 Montrose Blvd Ste 800

Houston, TX 77006

Defendant Attorneys

Tamara L. Kapaloski

Attorney at DORSEY & WHITNEY LLP

111 S Main St 21St Fl

Salt Lake City, UT 84111-2176

Brett L. Foster

Attorney at DORSEY & WHITNEY LLP

111 S Main St 21St Fl

Salt Lake City, UT 84111-2176

Mark A. Miller

Attorney at DORSEY & WHITNEY LLP

111 S Main St 21St Fl

Salt Lake City, UT 84111-2176

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) Report on the Final Decision of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (lnp) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

#19

(#19) ORDER granting #18 Motion to Dismiss. It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that all claims asserted by DatRec are hereby dismissed with prejudice. It is further ORDERED that each party will be responsible for its own costs and attorneys' fees. Case Closed. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 9/8/2020. (lnp) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

18 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#18

(#18) Plaintiff's MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice filed by Plaintiff Datrec. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Buschmann, Craig) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

#17

(#17) ORDER OF RECUSAL - Judge David Barlow recused. Case reassigned to Judge Dee Benson for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 8/18/20. (jrj) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

#13

(#13) NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Datrec, Defendants MyHeritage Ltd, MyHeritage USA Inc. Form due by 8/27/2020. (alf) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

8 #2

Exhibit

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#8

(#8) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of William P. Ramey, III , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3675463,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Datrec. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit)(Buschmann, Craig) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (kn) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

2 #2

Exhibit US8381309

2 #1

Exhibit US8156158

#2

(#12) Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, filed by Defendants MyHeritage Ltd, MyHeritage USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Foster, Brett) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

#1

(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Plaintiff Datrec is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (kn) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Report on the Final Decision of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (lnp) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER granting #18 Motion to Dismiss. It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that all claims asserted by DatRec are hereby dismissed with prejudice. It is further ORDERED that each party will be responsible for its own costs and attorneys' fees. Case Closed. Signed by Judge Dee Benson on 9/8/2020. (lnp) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Plaintiff's MOTION to Dismiss With Prejudice filed by Plaintiff Datrec. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Buschmann, Craig) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER OF RECUSAL - Judge David Barlow recused. Case reassigned to Judge Dee Benson for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 8/18/20. (jrj) (Entered: 08/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • Docket(#16) All Consent/Reassignment Forms have now been received. After review of all forms, Case Reassigned to District Judge per request of one or more party(s). Case randomly assigned to Judge David Barlow. Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead no longer assigned to the case. (alf) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • Docket(#15) RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Plaintiff Datrec. (alf) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • Docket(#14) RECEIVED Consent/Reassignment Form from Defendants MyHeritage Ltd, MyHeritage USA Inc. (alf) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE - This case is assigned to a magistrate judge. To consent or request reassignment, use # the form on this link or use the included form for non-efilers and send it toconsents@utd.uscourts.govwithin 15 days or mail to the court with Attention: Consent Clerk on the envelope. Notice e-mailed or mailed to Plaintiff Datrec, Defendants MyHeritage Ltd, MyHeritage USA Inc. Form due by 8/27/2020. (alf) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Stipulated MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #2 Complaint, filed by Defendants MyHeritage Ltd, MyHeritage USA Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Foster, Brett) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Tamara L. Kapaloski on behalf of MyHeritage Ltd, MyHeritage USA Inc (Kapaloski, Tamara) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark A. Miller on behalf of MyHeritage Ltd, MyHeritage USA Inc (Miller, Mark) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Brett L. Foster on behalf of MyHeritage Ltd, MyHeritage USA Inc (Foster, Brett) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of William P. Ramey, III , Registration fee $ 250, receipt number AUTDC-3675463,Attorneys awaiting Pro Hac Vice admission should immediately register to efile and receive electronic notification of case activity in the District of Utah at #https://www.pacer.uscourts.gov/cmecf/dcbk.html.Registration requests will not be approved until the court has granted the pro hac vice motion. Instructions are available on the court's website at #https://www.utd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-electronic-case-filing. filed by Plaintiff Datrec. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit)(Buschmann, Craig) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Datrec as to MyHeritage Ltd served on 7/27/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. (Buschmann, Craig) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Datrec as to MyHeritage USA Inc served on 7/27/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. (Buschmann, Craig) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to MyHeritage Ltd. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to MyHeritage USA Inc. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (jl) (Entered: 07/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (kn) (Entered: 07/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number AUTDC-3653988) filed by Datrec. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit US8156158, #2 Exhibit US8381309, #3 Exhibit US8990198) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead (Buschmann, Craig) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead. Plaintiff Datrec is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 400.00 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (kn) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less