This case was last updated from PACER on 09/29/2021 at 07:03:27 (UTC).

DATREC, LLC v. YARDI SYSTEMS, INC.

Case Summary

On 07/30/2021 DATREC, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against YARDI SYSTEMS, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:21-CV-00785

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DATREC, LLC

Defendant

YARDI SYSTEMS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William P. Ramey, III

Attorney at Ramey & Schwaller, LLP

5020 Montose Blvd., Suite 800

Houston, TX 77006

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by DATREC, LLC. YARDI SYSTEMS, INC. served on 8/26/2021, answer due 9/16/2021. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to YARDI SYSTEMS, INC.. (ir) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by DATREC, LLC. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit US8381309

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15069279), filed by DATREC, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit US8381309, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ramey, William) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by DATREC, LLC. YARDI SYSTEMS, INC. served on 8/26/2021, answer due 9/16/2021. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to YARDI SYSTEMS, INC.. (ir) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (ir) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketAll parties shall flatten all documents before e-filing. All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/ (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by DATREC, LLC. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15069279), filed by DATREC, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit US8381309, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ramey, William) (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Yardi Systems Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where DatRec, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William P. Ramey, III