This case was last updated from PACER on 08/21/2020 at 12:14:57 (UTC).

Dathan Gavin Lankford v. Juul Labs, Inc et al

Case Summary

On 06/22/2020 Dathan Gavin Lankford filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Juul Labs, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is William H. Orrick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-04120

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William H. Orrick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dathan Gavin Lankford

Defendants

Philip Morris USA Inc

James Monsees

Altria Enterprises LLC

Alternative Ingredients, Inc.

NJOY LLC f/k/a NJOY Vapor Products, LLC

Adam Bowen

Altria Client Services LLC

Altria Group Distribution Company

Riaz Valani

eLiquitech, Inc.

McLane Company, Inc.

Nicholas Pritzker

Circle K Stores, Inc.

Altria Group, Inc.

Mother Murphy's Labs, Inc.

Juul Labs, Inc

Hoyoung Huh

Tobacco Technology, Inc.

NJOY LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

T. Roe Frazer, II

Attorney at Frazer PLC

30 Burton Hills Boulevard, Suite 450

Nashville, TN 37215

Patrick McMurtray

Attorney at Frazer PLC

30 Butron Hills Boulevard, Suite 450

Nashville, TN 37215

Thomas Roe Frazer, III

Attorney at Frazer PLC

30 Burton Hills Boulevard, Suite 450

Nashville, TN 37215

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Alternative Ingredients, Inc., Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Enterprises LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Adam Bowen, Circle K Stores, Inc., Hoyoung Huh, Juul Labs, Inc, McLane Company, Inc., James Monsees, Mother Murphy's Labs, Inc., NJOY LLC, Philip Morris USA Inc, Nicholas Pritzker, Tobacco Technology, Inc., Riaz Valani, eLiquitech, Inc.. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2020) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Frazer, T. Roe) (Filed on 6/22/2020) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - Original Complaint filed in E.D. Tenn

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Alternative Ingredients, Inc., Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Enterprises LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Adam Bowen, Circle K Stores, Inc., Hoyoung Huh, Juul Labs, Inc, McLane Company, Inc., James Monsees, Mother Murphy's Labs, Inc., NJOY LLC f/k/a NJOY Vapor Products, LLC, Philip Morris USA Inc, Nicholas Pritzker, Tobacco Technology, Inc., Riaz Valani, eLiquitech, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14607911.). Filed byDathan Gavin Lankford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Original Complaint filed in E.D. Tenn, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Frazer, T. Roe) (Filed on 6/22/2020) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Alternative Ingredients, Inc., Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Enterprises LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Adam Bowen, Circle K Stores, Inc., Hoyoung Huh, Juul Labs, Inc, McLane Company, Inc., James Monsees, Mother Murphy's Labs, Inc., NJOY LLC, Philip Morris USA Inc, Nicholas Pritzker, Tobacco Technology, Inc., Riaz Valani, eLiquitech, Inc.. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2020) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2020
  • DocketDIRECT FILED MEMBER CASE OPENED: re 19-md-2913, Dathan Gavin Lankford v. Juul Labs, Inc et al, Opened in California Northern District as 3:20-cv-4120-WHO pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order cc: JPMDL (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/24/2020) (Entered: 06/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Judge William H. Orrick. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (mbcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2020) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Frazer, T. Roe) (Filed on 6/22/2020) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Alternative Ingredients, Inc., Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Enterprises LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Adam Bowen, Circle K Stores, Inc., Hoyoung Huh, Juul Labs, Inc, McLane Company, Inc., James Monsees, Mother Murphy's Labs, Inc., NJOY LLC f/k/a NJOY Vapor Products, LLC, Philip Morris USA Inc, Nicholas Pritzker, Tobacco Technology, Inc., Riaz Valani, eLiquitech, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14607911.). Filed byDathan Gavin Lankford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Original Complaint filed in E.D. Tenn, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Frazer, T. Roe) (Filed on 6/22/2020) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NJOY, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Circle K Stores Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where JUUL Labs, Inc. is a litigant