This case was last updated from PACER on 09/11/2021 at 10:17:25 (UTC).

DataCloud Technologies, LLC v. Newfold Digital, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/13/2021 DataCloud Technologies, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Newfold Digital, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Leonard P. Stark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01020

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonard P. Stark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DataCloud Technologies, LLC

Defendant

Newfold Digital, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James F. McDonough, III

Jonathan R. Miller

Stamatios Stamoulis

Attorney at Stamoulis & Weinblatt LLC

800 N. West Street, Third Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Richard Charles Weinblatt

Attorney at Stamoulis & Weinblatt LLC

800 N. West Street, Third Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by DataCloud Technologies, LLC: (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by DataCloud Technologies, LLC. Newfold Digital, Inc. served on 7/15/2021, answer due 8/5/2021. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

#6

(#6) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James f. McDonough, III and Jonathan R. Miller - filed by DataCloud Technologies, LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

#5

(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (twk) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Brainbox Innovations, LLC for DataCloud Technologies, LLC filed by DataCloud Technologies, LLC. (twk) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

#3

(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,560,613 B1; 7,209,959 B1; 8,607,139 B2; 8,762,498 B2. (twk) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

#2

(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (twk) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Newfold Digital, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3656692.) - filed by DataCloud Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(twk) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by DataCloud Technologies, LLC: (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorneys Jonathan R. Miller, James F. McDonough, III for DataCloud Technologies, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (twk) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James F. McDonough, III and Jonathan R. Miller filed by DataCloud Technologies, LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 7/22/21. (ntl) (Entered: 07/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. (rjb) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by DataCloud Technologies, LLC. Newfold Digital, Inc. served on 7/15/2021, answer due 8/5/2021. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James f. McDonough, III and Jonathan R. Miller - filed by DataCloud Technologies, LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (twk) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Brainbox Innovations, LLC for DataCloud Technologies, LLC filed by DataCloud Technologies, LLC. (twk) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) 6,560,613 B1; 7,209,959 B1; 8,607,139 B2; 8,762,498 B2. (twk) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (twk) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Newfold Digital, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3656692.) - filed by DataCloud Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(twk) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DataCloud Technologies, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JONATHAN R. MILLER

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard Charles Weinblatt