This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/05/2021 at 09:19:56 (UTC).

DataCloud Technologies, LLC v. Arista Networks, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/04/2021 DataCloud Technologies, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Arista Networks, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Delaware District. The Judge overseeing this case is Leonard P. Stark. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-00155

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leonard P. Stark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DataCloud Technologies, LLC

Defendant

Arista Networks, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stamatios Stamoulis

Attorney at Stamoulis & Weinblatt LLC

800 N. West Street, Third Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Richard Charles Weinblatt

Attorney at Stamoulis & Weinblatt LLC

800 N. West Street, Third Floor

Wilmington, DE 19801

Jonathan R. Miller

Travis E. Lynch

James F. McDonough, III

Defendant Attorney

Jennifer Ying

Attorney at Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell LLP

1201 North Market Street, P.O. Box 1347

Wilmington, DE 19899

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #9 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to May 3, 2021 filed by DataCloud Technologies, LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 3/25/21. (ntl) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME for Defendant to answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint to May 3, 2021 - filed by DataCloud Technologies, LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 03/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #8 Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER complaint to April 1, 2021 filed by Arista Networks, Inc. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/25/21. (ntl) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Joint STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME to ANSWER complaint to April 1, 2021 - filed by Arista Networks, Inc.. (Ying, Jennifer) (Entered: 02/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney James F. McDonough, III for DataCloud Technologies, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (amf) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Travis E. Lynch for DataCloud Technologies, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (amf) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketPro Hac Vice Attorney Jonathan R. Miller for DataCloud Technologies, LLC added for electronic noticing. Pursuant to Local Rule 83.5 (d)., Delaware counsel shall be the registered users of CM/ECF and shall be required to file all papers. (amf) (Entered: 02/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSO ORDERED, re #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James F. McDonough, III, Jonathan R. Miller, and Travis E. Lynch filed by DataCloud Technologies, LLC. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/17/21. (ntl) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Attorney James F. McDonough, III, Jonathan R. Miller, and Travis E. Lynch - filed by DataCloud Technologies, LLC. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 02/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by DataCloud Technologies, LLC. Arista Networks, Inc. served on 2/9/2021, answer due 3/2/2021. (Stamoulis, Stamatios) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Leonard P. Stark. Please include the initials of the Judge (LPS) after the case number on all documents filed. Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-00155-LPS, 1:21-cv-00164-LPS (rjb) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summonses Issued (please complete the top portion of the form and print out for use/service). (apk) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 7.1: identifying Corporate Parent Brainbox Innovations, LLC for DataCloud Technologies, LLC filed by DataCloud Technologies, LLC. (apk) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report to the Commissioner of Patents and Trademarks for Patent/Trademark Number(s) US 6,560,613 B1 ;US 7,398,298 B1 ;US 8,156,499 B2 ;US 8,370,457 B2 ;US 8,762,498 B2 ;US RE44,723 E. (apk) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice, Consent and Referral forms re: U.S. Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. (apk) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed with Jury Demand against Arista Networks, Inc. - Magistrate Consent Notice to Pltf. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ADEDC-3507991.) - filed by DataCloud Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Civil Cover Sheet)(apk) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DataCloud Technologies, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Arista Networks, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer Ying