This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/19/2019 at 07:12:42 (UTC).

Data Scape Limited v. Spotify USA Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/20/2019 Data Scape Limited filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Spotify USA Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Philip S. Gutierrez and Steve Kim. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-04367

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Philip S. Gutierrez

Referral Judge

Steve Kim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Data Scape Limited

Defendants

Spotify Technology S.A.

Spotify USA Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Reza Mirzaie

Attorney at Russ August and Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Philip X Wang

Attorney at Russ August and Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Marc A Fenster

Attorney at Russ August and Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

C Jay Chung

Attorney at Russ August and Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Brian D Ledahl

Attorney at Russ August and Kabat

12424 Wilshire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Paul A Kroeger

Attorney at Russ August and Kabat

1224 Wilshire Boulevard 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher L Larson

Attorney at Fenwick and West LLP

555 California Street 12Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Jonathan Thomas McMichael

Attorney at Fenwick and West LLP

1191 Second Avenue 10Th Floor

Seattle, WA 98101

Crystal Ada Kelechi Nwaneri

Attorney at Fenwick and West LLP

801 California Street

Mountain View, CA 94041

Bryan A Kohm

Attorney at Fenwick and West LLP

555 California Street 12Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Crystal Ada Kelechi Nwaneri on behalf of Defendant Spotify USA Inc. (Attorney Crystal Ada Kelechi Nwaneri added to party Spotify USA Inc.(pty:dft))(Nwaneri, Crystal) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#19

(#19) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Christopher L Larson on behalf of Defendant Spotify USA Inc. (Attorney Christopher L Larson added to party Spotify USA Inc.(pty:dft))(Larson, Christopher) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jonathan Thomas McMichael on behalf of Defendant Spotify USA Inc. (Attorney Jonathan Thomas McMichael added to party Spotify USA Inc.(pty:dft))(McMichael, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#17

(#17) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Notice of Interested Parties Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1-1 filed by Defendant Spotify USA Inc. identifying Spotify AB as Corporate Parent. (Kohm, Bryan) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

16 #8

Proposed Order

16 #7

Exhibit F to Kohm Declaration

16 #6

Exhibit E to Kohm Declaration

16 #5

Exhibit D to Kohm Declaration

#16

(#16) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Spotify USA Inc. Spotify USA Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/26/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bryan A. Kohm in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #2 Exhibit A to Kohm Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Kohm Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Kohm Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to Kohm Declaration, #6 Exhibit E to Kohm Declaration, #7 Exhibit F to Kohm Declaration, #8 Proposed Order) (Kohm, Bryan) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Data Scape Limited. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#5

(#5) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Data Scape Limited, (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Data Scape Limited (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#3

(#3) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Data Scape Limited. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Data Scape Limited. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#11) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Spotify Technology S.A. (esa) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Crystal Ada Kelechi Nwaneri on behalf of Defendant Spotify USA Inc. (Attorney Crystal Ada Kelechi Nwaneri added to party Spotify USA Inc.(pty:dft))(Nwaneri, Crystal) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Christopher L Larson on behalf of Defendant Spotify USA Inc. (Attorney Christopher L Larson added to party Spotify USA Inc.(pty:dft))(Larson, Christopher) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jonathan Thomas McMichael on behalf of Defendant Spotify USA Inc. (Attorney Jonathan Thomas McMichael added to party Spotify USA Inc.(pty:dft))(McMichael, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Notice of Interested Parties Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1-1 filed by Defendant Spotify USA Inc. identifying Spotify AB as Corporate Parent. (Kohm, Bryan) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant Spotify USA Inc. Spotify USA Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/26/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bryan A. Kohm in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, #2 Exhibit A to Kohm Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Kohm Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Kohm Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to Kohm Declaration, #6 Exhibit E to Kohm Declaration, #7 Exhibit F to Kohm Declaration, #8 Proposed Order) (Kohm, Bryan) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Spotify USA Inc. answer now due 7/9/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Spotify USA Inc. Spotify USA Inc..(Attorney Bryan A Kohm added to party Spotify USA Inc.(pty:dft))(Kohm, Bryan) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:18-cv-10653 PSG(SKx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian and Judge Dean D. Pregerson to Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:19-cv-04367 PSG(SKx). Signed by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez (rn) (Entered: 05/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Spotify USA Inc. (esa) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Spotify Technology S.A. (esa) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (esa) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Data Scape Limited. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Data Scape Limited. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Data Scape Limited. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Data Scape Limited, (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Data Scape Limited (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Data Scape Limited. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Data Scape Limited. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23770704 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Data Scape Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Attorney Reza Mirzaie added to party Data Scape Limited(pty:pla))(Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Spotify Technology S.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where Spotify USA, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Data Scape Limited is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Christopher L. Larson