This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/22/2019 at 05:36:37 (UTC).

Data Scape Limited v. iHEARTMEDIA, INC.

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 Data Scape Limited filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against iHEARTMEDIA, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-00483

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Data Scape Limited

Defendant

iHEARTMEDIA, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

C. Jay Chung

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Philip X. Wang

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Paul A. Kroeger

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Marc A. Fenster

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Brian D. Ledahl

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Reza Mirzaie

Attorney at Russ August & Kabat

12424 Wilshire Blvd., 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Defendant Attorney

Ryan K Yagura

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers - LA

400 South Hope Street, 18Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2899

 

Court Documents

10 #1

Proposed Order

#10

(#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer - Defendant iHeartMedia, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by iHEARTMEDIA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Yagura, Ryan) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan K Yagura on behalf of iHEARTMEDIA, INC. . Attorney Ryan K Yagura added to party iHEARTMEDIA, INC. (pty:dft) (Yagura, Ryan) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Data Scape Limited. iHEARTMEDIA, INC. served on 8/23/2019, answer due 9/13/2019. (Kroeger, Paul) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to iHEARTMEDIA, INC.. (am) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#6

(#6) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (am) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Data Scape Limited. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Related Cases by Data Scape Limited (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#3

(#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Data Scape Limited. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of AO 120 Report Form by Data Scape Limited (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12512648), filed by Data Scape Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2019
  • Set/Reset Deadlines: iHEARTMEDIA, INC. answer due 11/12/2019. (am) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Text Order GRANTING #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Alan D Albright. Came on for consideration is Defendants Motion. Noting that it is unopposed, the Court GRANTS the Motion. Defendant shall have up to and including November 12, 2019 to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jy) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer - Defendant iHeartMedia, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by iHEARTMEDIA, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Yagura, Ryan) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ryan K Yagura on behalf of iHEARTMEDIA, INC. . Attorney Ryan K Yagura added to party iHEARTMEDIA, INC. (pty:dft) (Yagura, Ryan) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Data Scape Limited. iHEARTMEDIA, INC. served on 8/23/2019, answer due 9/13/2019. (Kroeger, Paul) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Issued as to iHEARTMEDIA, INC.. (am) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (am) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (am) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Data Scape Limited. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Related Cases by Data Scape Limited (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Data Scape Limited. (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of AO 120 Report Form by Data Scape Limited (Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-12512648), filed by Data Scape Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mirzaie, Reza) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Data Scape Limited is a litigant

Latest cases where iHeartMedia, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ryan K Yagura