This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/14/2022 at 11:49:43 (UTC).

DATA et al v. A.O. SMITH CORPORATION et al

Case Summary

On 07/22/2019 DATA filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against A O SMITH CORPORATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Arthur J. Schwab, Marilyn J. Horan and Cynthia Reed Eddy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00879

  • Filing Date:

    07/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Cynthia Reed Eddy

Presiding Judges

Arthur J. Schwab

Marilyn J. Horan

 

Party Details

Cross Defendants, Defendants and Cross Claimants

ZURN INDUSTRIES

MW CUSTOM PAPERS, LLC

POWERMASTER PACIFIC PRODUCTS

MET-PRO CORPORATION

BAKER HUGHES, a GE Company, LLC

NORTH AMERICAN MANUFACTURING CO.

ERIE CITY IRON WORKS

CARVER PUMP COMPANY

BW/IP, INC.

UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION

CATERPILLAR GLOBAL MINING AMERICA, LLC

HYSTER-YALE GROUP, INC.

ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS INC.

ACCO MATERIAL HANDLING SOLUTION, INC.

OSRAM SYLVANIA, INC.

TUTHILL CORPORATION

RILEY POWER, INC.

WASHINGTON GROUP INTERNATIONAL

ATWOOD & MORRILL Co., Inc.

FLOWSERVE CORPORATION

Cross Claimants, Cross Defendants and Defendants

MW CUSTOM PAPERS, LLC

POWERMASTER PACIFIC PRODUCTS

NORTH AMERICAN MANUFACTURING CO.

CARVER PUMP COMPANY

BW/IP, INC.

UNITED STATES STEEL CORPORATION

CATERPILLAR GLOBAL MINING AMERICA, LLC

HYSTER-YALE GROUP, INC.

ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS INC.

OSRAM SYLVANIA, INC.

RILEY POWER, INC.

WASHINGTON GROUP INTERNATIONAL

ATWOOD & MORRILL Co., Inc.

516 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Cross Claimant, Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

Michael A. Karaffa

Attorney at Marshall, Dennehey, Warner, Coleman & Goggin

Union Trust Building, 120 Olde Manor Lane

Moon Township, PA 15108

Shannan Cerrone

Two Ppg Place, Suite 400

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

John A. Turlik

Attorney at Segal McCambridge Singer & Mahoney

1818 Market Street, Suite 1700

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Joseph J. Welter

Attorney at Goldberg Segalla LLP

665 Main Street, Suite 400

Buffalo, NY 14203

Max T. Busatto

Attorney at Dickie, McCamey & Chilcote

Two Ppg Place, Suite 400

Pittsburgh, PA 15222-5402

Francis J. Stanek

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson PLLC

11 Grandview Circle, Suite 200

Canonsburg, PA 15317

Julie Nord Friedman

Attorney at Rawle & Henderson, LLP

The Henry W. Oliver Building, Suite 1000

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Ryan M. Krescanko

Attorney at Marshall, Dennehey, Warner, Coleman & Goggin

501 Grant Street, Suite 700

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Other Attorneys

Eric L. Horne

Attorney at Eckert, Seamans, Cherin & Mellott

600 Grant Street, 44Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Daniel J. Sinclair

Attorney at Eckert, Seamans, Cherin & Mellott

600 Grant Street, 44Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Charles McLeigh

11 Stanwix Street, Suite 1800

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Bryan S. Neft

Attorney at Spilman Thomas & Battle PLLC

One Oxford Centre, Suite 3440

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Joseph L. Orszulak, II

Attorney at Riley, Hewitt, Witte & Romano, P.C.

650 Washington Road, Suite 300

Pittsburgh, PA 15228

Jennifer E. Watson

Attorney at Wilbraham Lawler & Buba

603 Stanwix Street, Two Gateway Center, 17N

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

Adam S. Auchey

Attorney at Zimmer Kunz, PLLC

310 Grant Street, Suite 3000

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Adam J. Warhola

Attorney at Dickie, McCamey & Chilcote

Two Ppg Place, Suite 400

Pittsburgh, PA 15222-5402

Ronald J. Richert

Attorney at Willman & Silvaggio

5500 Corporate Drive, Suite 150

Pittsburgh, PA 15237

Joseph W. Selep

Attorney at Zimmer Kunz

310 Grant Street, Suite 3000

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

David F. Ryan

Attorney at Zimmer Kunz

600 Grant Street, 3300 U.S. Steel Tower

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Alba E Arriaga

Attorney at Riley, Hewitt, Witte & Romano, P.C.

650 Washington Road, Suite 300

Pittsburgh, PA 15228

156 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#1272

(#1272) Disclosure Statement identifying Redco Corp and Crane Holdings Co as corporate parent or other affiliate, by CRANE COMPANY, INC.. (Ross, Michael) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

#1273

(#1273) BRIEF in Support re #1255 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by FOSTER WHEELER LLC. (jd) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

1270 #3

Memo of Law

1270 #2

Proposed Order

1270 #1

Certificate of Service

1270 #1270

Main Document

1268 #1

Proposed Order

1268 #1268

Main Document

#1255

(#1270) Errata re #1255 Motion for Summary Judgment Reason for Correction: Separating documents for upload. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Memo of Law) (McMeekin, John) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

1 #21

Exhibit E16

1 #18

Exhibit E13

1 #17

Exhibit E12

1 #16

Exhibit E11

1 #15

Exhibit E10

1 #14

Exhibit E9

1 #13

Exhibit E8

1 #12

Exhibit E7

1 #11

Exhibit E6

1,682 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #1270 Errata. ERROR: Document should have been filed as two separate documents. CORRECTION: Attorney advised in future that documents of that nature are to be filed as separate documents. Clerk of Court docketed Memo in Support. Memorandum of Law MUST be filed as a separate docket entry linking to Motion (jd) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1272) Disclosure Statement identifying Redco Corp and Crane Holdings Co as corporate parent or other affiliate, by CRANE COMPANY, INC.. (Ross, Michael) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1271) TEXT ORDER granting #1268 Motion to Amend. Plaintiffs Responses to Motions for Summary Judgment on any substantive grounds not related to product identification, or any Daubert Motions, shall be filed on or before August 15, 2022. Defendants replies shall be filed on or before August 31, 2022. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 7/6/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ajs) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1273) BRIEF in Support re #1255 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by FOSTER WHEELER LLC. (jd) (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1270) Errata re #1255 Motion for Summary Judgment Reason for Correction: Separating documents for upload. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Memo of Law) (McMeekin, John) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1269) Errata re #1256 Concise Statement of Material Facts by FOSTER WHEELER LLC. Reason for Correction: Separating Appendix from MSJ. (Attachments: #1 Appendix) (McMeekin, John) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1268) Joint MOTION to Amend #1209 Order on Motion to Modify, by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. Motion(s) referred to Cynthia Reed Eddy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Neft, Bryan) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1267) TEXT ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re #1249 Motion to Dismiss:Plaintiff's Response to Motion due by 8/1/2022. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 7/5/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ajs) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1266) TEXT ORDER approving re #1230 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by DARLENE DATA. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2), IT IS ORDERED THAT THIS ACTION IS HEREBY DISMISSED with prejudice as to all claims and causes of action filed against Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, and as to all crossclaims filed by Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, with each party bearing their own attorneys fees and costs. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 7/5/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ajs) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1265) TEXT ORDER approving re #1229 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by DARLENE DATA and ELECTROLUX HOME PRODUCTS INC. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(2), IT IS ORDERED THAT THIS ACTION IS HEREBY DISMISSED with prejudice as to all claims and causes of action filed against Electrolux Home Products, Inc., and as to all crossclaims filed by Defendant Electrolux Home Products, Inc., with each party bearing their own attorney's fees and costs. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy on 7/5/2022. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ajs) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
1,303 More Docket Entries
  • 07/25/2019
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Cynthia Reed Eddy is now presiding. (jm) (Entered: 07/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Hugh McKeegan on behalf of CRANE COMPANY, INC.. (McKeegan, Hugh) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael J. Ross on behalf of CRANE COMPANY, INC.. (Ross, Michael) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • Docket(#7) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Arthur J. Schwab recused. Signed by Judge Arthur J. Schwab on 7/24/19. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (ms) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Disclosure Statement identifying None as corporate parent or other affiliate, by CRANE COMPANY, INC.. (Ross, Michael) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) JOINDER of CRANE COMPANY, INC. to #1 Notice of Removal,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6) (Ross, Michael) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Eric L. Horne on behalf of CBS CORPORATION. (Horne, Eric) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel J. Sinclair on behalf of CBS CORPORATION. (Sinclair, Daniel) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) JOINDER of CBS CORPORATION to #1 Notice of Removal,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Horne, Eric) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Common Pleas of Allegheny, case number 19-6253 with BOTH Copies attached: Lower Court Complaint, Answer, Docket Sheet, appearances, Proof of Service (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5218296), filed by GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E1, #7 Exhibit E2, #8 Exhibit E3, #9 Exhibit E4, #10 Exhibit E5, #11 Exhibit E6, #12 Exhibit E7, #13 Exhibit E8, #14 Exhibit E9, #15 Exhibit E10, #16 Exhibit E11, #17 Exhibit E12, #18 Exhibit E13, #19 Exhibit E14, #20 Exhibit E15, #21 Exhibit E16, #22 Exhibit E17, #23 Exhibit E18, #24 Exhibit E19, #25 Exhibit E20, #26 Exhibit E21) (jd) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ACCO MATERIAL HANDLING SOLUTION, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where TUTHILL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where BAKER HUGHES INCORPORATED is a litigant