This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/16/2022 at 09:35:03 (UTC).

Daru v. Hyatt Corporation

Case Summary

On 03/17/2022 Daru filed a Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination lawsuit against Hyatt Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lewis T. Babcock and Michael E. Hegarty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-00669

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Lewis T. Babcock

Michael E. Hegarty

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jozsef Daru

Defendant

Hyatt Corporation doing business as Grand Hyatt Vail

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gary Martoccio

Attorney at Spielberger Law Group

4890 West Kennedy Boulevard, Suite 950

Tampa, FL 33609

Defendant Attorney

Gary Everett Thomas

Attorney at Kabat Chapman & Ozmer

171 17Th Street N.W., Suite 1550

Atlanta, GA 30363

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued. (jcharl, ) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Hyatt Corporation d/b/a Grand Hyatt Vail by Plaintiff Jozsef Daru. (Martoccio, Gary) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (trvo, ) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

#6

(#6) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 3/18/2022. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. All future pleadings should be designated as 22-cv-00669-MEH. (trvo, ) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

#7

(#7) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (trvo, ) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

#8

(#8) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 21 March 2022. Consent Form due by 5/18/2022. Proposed Scheduling Order due 5/26/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 5/31/2022 01:15 PM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jozsef Daru. Hyatt Corporation served on 3/23/2022, answer due 4/13/2022. (Martoccio, Gary) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Gary Everett Thomas added to party Hyatt Corporation(pty:dft) by Hyatt Corporation.(Thomas, Gary) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

#11

(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Hyatt Hotels Corporation for Hyatt Corporation. (Thomas, Gary) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Hyatt Hotels Corporation for Hyatt Corporation. (Thomas, Gary) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Gary Everett Thomas added to party Hyatt Corporation(pty:dft) by Hyatt Corporation.(Thomas, Gary) (Entered: 04/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jozsef Daru. Hyatt Corporation served on 3/23/2022, answer due 4/13/2022. (Martoccio, Gary) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 21 March 2022. Consent Form due by 5/18/2022. Proposed Scheduling Order due 5/26/2022. Scheduling Conference set for 5/31/2022 01:15 PM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (cmadr, ) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (trvo, ) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 3/18/2022. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. All future pleadings should be designated as 22-cv-00669-MEH. (trvo, ) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (trvo, ) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS REQUEST as to Hyatt Corporation d/b/a Grand Hyatt Vail by Plaintiff Jozsef Daru. (Martoccio, Gary) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No Summons Issued. (jcharl, ) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (jcharl, ) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Hyatt Corporation d/b/a Grand Hyatt Vail (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-8368209)Attorney Gary Martoccio added to party Jozsef Daru(pty:pla), filed by Jozsef Daru. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Martoccio, Gary) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hyatt Corporation is a litigant