This case was last updated from PACER on 07/05/2019 at 09:52:34 (UTC).

Darren James & Associates, Inc. v. Moleads, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/24/2019 Darren James Associates, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Moleads, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr and John W. deGravelles. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00245

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr

Presiding Judge

John W. deGravelles

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Darren James & Associates, Inc.

Defendant

Moleads, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

David H. Ogwyn

Attorney at Ogwyn Law Firm, LLC

Suite B, 4224 Bluebonnet Blvd

Baton Rouge, LA 70809

Michael Eugene Platte

Attorney at Ogwyn Law Firm, LLC

4224 Bluebonnet, Suite B

Baton Rouge, LA 70809

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER: The Clerk's Office shall STRIKE record documents 9 through 11 and the Motion to File Separate Status Report (R. Dec. 9) and Motion to Supplement Motion for Leave to File Separate Status Report and Motion to Strike (R. Doc. 11) are DENIED AS MOOT. The scheduling conference is RESET for 8/22/2019 at 3:00 p.m. in chambers to allow plaintiff time to effect service upon defendants. The joint status report is to be filed no later than 8/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/18/2019. (SGO) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

#8

(#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Moleads, LLC filed by Darren James & Associates, Inc.(SGO) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

6 #2

Proposed Pleading;

6 #1

Attachment

#6

(#6) First MOTION to Amend Petition by Darren James & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Proposed Pleading;)(Platte, Michael) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1653, on or before 6/13/2019 the plaintiff shall file an amended complaint providing the citizenship of Plaintiff Darren James & Associates, Inc. and defendant MoLeads, LLC, by setting forth all citizenship particulars required to sustain federal diversity jurisdiction. Amended Pleadings due by 6/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/6/2019. (SWE) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1653, on or before 5/28/2019, the plaintiff shall file an amended complaint providing the citizenship of plaintiff Darren James & Associates, Inc. and defendant MoLeads, LLC, by setting forth all citizenship particulars required to sustain federal diversity jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/22/2019. (SGO) Modified on 5/22/2019 to edit text (SGO). (Entered: 05/22/2019)

#3

(#3) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/27/2019 at 02:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 6/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/6/2019. (SGO) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Moleads, LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (KAH) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

1 #2

Attachment

1 #1

Attachment

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Moleads, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1931685.), filed by Darren James & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment)(Platte, Michael) Modified on 4/24/2019 to flatten attachments (KAH). (Entered: 04/24/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2019
  • Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings (Court Use Only) (SGO) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER: The Clerk's Office shall STRIKE record documents 9 through 11 and the Motion to File Separate Status Report (R. Dec. 9) and Motion to Supplement Motion for Leave to File Separate Status Report and Motion to Strike (R. Doc. 11) are DENIED AS MOOT. The scheduling conference is RESET for 8/22/2019 at 3:00 p.m. in chambers to allow plaintiff time to effect service upon defendants. The joint status report is to be filed no later than 8/8/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/18/2019. (SGO) (Entered: 06/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: 11 MOTION to Supplement Motion for Leave to File Separate Status Report MOTION to Strike an Incorrectly Filed Document 10 Status Report. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • (#11) STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD MOTION to Supplement Motion for Leave to File Separate Status Report, MOTION to Strike an Incorrectly Filed Document 10 Status Report by Darren James & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Order, # 2 Proposed Pleading; Status Report, # 3 Exhibit Proof of Attempted Service, # 4 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Platte, Michael) Modified on 6/14/2019 to edit the text (SWE). Modified on 6/19/2019 to remove the document as it has been stricken per RD 12 (SGO). (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • (#10) STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD First STATUS REPORT by Darren James & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Service Attempt, # 2 Exhibit Proof of Service)(Platte, Michael) Modified on 6/19/2019 to remove the document as it has been stricken per RD 12 (SGO). (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: 9 First MOTION for Leave to File Separate Status Report. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (SWE) (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • (#9) STRICKEN FROM THE RECORD First MOTION for Leave to File Separate Status Report by Darren James & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Pleading; Order)(Platte, Michael) Modified on 6/19/2019 to remove the document as it has been stricken per RD 12 (SGO). (Entered: 06/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Moleads, LLC filed by Darren James & Associates, Inc.(SGO) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Amend Petition for Damages. The Clerk's Office shall filed R. Doc. 6-2 into the record of this matter as it properly alleges citizenship of Plaintiff Darren James & Associates, Inc. and defendant MoLeads, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/10/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO) (Entered: 06/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #6 First MOTION to Amend Petition. This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (LT) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) First MOTION to Amend Petition by Darren James & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Proposed Pleading;)(Platte, Michael) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1653, on or before 6/13/2019 the plaintiff shall file an amended complaint providing the citizenship of Plaintiff Darren James & Associates, Inc. and defendant MoLeads, LLC, by setting forth all citizenship particulars required to sustain federal diversity jurisdiction. Amended Pleadings due by 6/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 6/6/2019. (SWE) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1653, on or before 5/28/2019, the plaintiff shall file an amended complaint providing the citizenship of plaintiff Darren James & Associates, Inc. and defendant MoLeads, LLC, by setting forth all citizenship particulars required to sustain federal diversity jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/22/2019. (SGO) Modified on 5/22/2019 to edit text (SGO). (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/27/2019 at 02:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 6/13/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 5/6/2019. (SGO) (Entered: 05/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Case reassigned to Judge John W. deGravelles. Chief Judge Shelly D. Dick no longer assigned to the case. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (NLT) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Moleads, LLC. (NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve both the summons and all attachments in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4.) (KAH) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Moleads, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1931685.), filed by Darren James & Associates, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Attachment)(Platte, Michael) Modified on 4/24/2019 to flatten attachments (KAH). (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.