This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/02/2020 at 08:35:21 (UTC).

Darcie Almada v. BMW of North America, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 08/03/2020 Darcie Almada filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against BMW of North America, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Autumn D. Spaeth and David O. Carter. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-01427

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Autumn D. Spaeth

Presiding Judge

David O. Carter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Darcie Almada

Defendants

BMW of North America, LLC

Does 1 through 20, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Christopher Michael Lovasz

Attorney at Consumer Legal Services PC

2330 Long Beach Boulevard

Long Beach, CA 90806

Jeeho Henberwithz Lim

Attorney at Consumer Legal Services PC

2330 Long Beach Boulevard

Long Beach, CA 90806

Defendant Attorneys

Kate S Lehrman

Attorney at Lehrman Law Group

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Jacqueline Bruce Chinery

Attorney at Lehrman Law Group

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Jason Michael Barmasse

Attorney at Lehrman Law Group

12121 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90025

 

Court Documents

12 #1

Proposed Order

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Declaration Kate S. Lehrman

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) First STIPULATION to Continue Rule 26(f) Conference from 10/5/2020 to 10/26/2020 filed by Plaintiff Darcie Almada Darcie Almada. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lim, Jeeho) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) First NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jeeho Henberwithz Lim on behalf of Plaintiff Darcie Almada (Lim, Jeeho) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STATEMENT Joint Rule 26(f) Statement (Lim, Jeeho) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge David O. Carter. Scheduling Conference set for 10/5/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge David O. Carter. (dgo) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOLLOWING ASSIGNMENT OF CIVIL CASE TO JUDGE CARTER upon filing of the complaint by Judge David O. Carter. (dgo) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC, re Jury Demand #3 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #4 , Complaint - (Discovery), Answer to Complaint (Discovery) served on August 4, 2020. (Lehrman, Kate) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge David O. Carter and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (esa) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF ANSWER to Complaint, Jury Demand, filed by defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 3)(esa) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF SERVICE OF PROCESS TRANSMITTAL executed by Plaintiff Darcie Almada, upon Defendant BMW of North America, LLC served on 7/2/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation, Agent for Service of Process by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (non-conformed, submitted as document 1, attachment 2) (esa) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants BMW of North America, LLC, Does, Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Darcie Almada. (filed in state court 5/26/20, submitted as document 1, attachment 2, p. 7) (esa) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC, identifying BMW (US) Holding Corp.. (Lehrman, Kate) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC.. (Lehrman, Kate) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Lehrman, Kate) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Orange County Superior Court, case number 30-2020-01145317 Receipt No: ACACDC-27475950 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant BMW of North America, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Kate S. Lehrman, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (Attorney Kate S Lehrman added to party BMW of North America, LLC(pty:dft))(Lehrman, Kate) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BMW OF NORTH AMERICA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jacqueline Bruce Chinery

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason Michael Barmasse

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kate S Lehrman