Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/25/2021 at 09:12:48 (UTC).

DANTZLER et al v. FCA US LLC et al

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 DANTZLER filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FCA US LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Leda D. Wettre and Madeline Cox Arleo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-06961

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Leda D. Wettre

Presiding Judge

Madeline Cox Arleo

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

THELMA PANNELL

FONTAINE DANTZLER

Defendants

LESTER GLENN AUTO GROUP

STELLANTIS N.V. F/K/A FIAT CHRYSLER AUTOMOBILES N.V.

CHRYSLER LLC

MOPAR VEHICLE PROTECTION

CHRYSLER PLYMOUTH OF PARAMUS INC.

FCA HOLDCO B.V.

DAIMLER CHRYSLER FINANCIAL SERVICES AMERICA LLC

DAIMLERCHRYSLER SERVICE CONTRACTS, INC.

FCA North America Holdings LLC

FCA US LLC

12000 Chrysler Drive

Highland Park, MI 48288

Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V.

CHRYSLER SERVICE CONTRACTS, INC.

STELLANTIS N.V.

JOHN DOES 1-10

ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10

OLD CARCO SERVICE CONTRACTS, INC.

FIAT CHRYSLER AUTOMOBILES, NV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARRY J. GAINEY

Attorney at GAINEY McKENNA & EGLESTON

375 Abbott Road

Paramus, NJ 07652

Defendant Attorney

JAMES SIMON COONS

Attorney at ANSA ASSUNCAO, LLP

100 Matawan Road, Suite 410

Matawan, NJ 07747

 

Court Documents

11 #1

Proposed Order

#11

(#11) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Plaintiffs' Amended Class Action Complaint. Attorney JAMES SIMON COONS for LESTER GLENN AUTO GROUP added. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(COONS, JAMES) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

#10

(#10) AMENDED COMPLAINT against ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10, CHRYSLER LLC, CHRYSLER PLYMOUTH OF PARAMUS INC., CHRYSLER SERVICE CONTRACTS, INC., DAIMLER CHRYSLER FINANCIAL SERVICES AMERICA LLC, DAIMLERCHRYSLER SERVICE CONTRACTS, INC., FCA HOLDCO B.V., FCA NORTH AMERICA HOLDINGS LLC, FCA US LLC, FIAT CHRYSLER AUTOMOBILES, NV, JOHN DOES 1-10, LESTER GLENN AUTO GROUP, MOPAR VEHICLE PROTECTION, STELLANTIS N.V., Old Carco Service Contracts, Inc., filed by THELMA PANNELL, FONTAINE DANTZLER.(GAINEY, BARRY) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

#9

(#9) Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by FONTAINE DANTZLER, THELMA PANNELL re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint (GAINEY, BARRY) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

#8

(#8) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice SCOTT H. MORGAN to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12389399.) (COONS, JAMES) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

#7

(#7) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice STEPHEN A. D'AUNOY to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12389363.) (COONS, JAMES) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by LESTER GLENN AUTO GROUP. (COONS, JAMES) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

4 #2

Proposed Order

4 #1

Memorandum of Law In Support

#4

(#4) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint by LESTER GLENN AUTO GROUP. Responses due by 5/3/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law In Support, #2 Proposed Order)(COONS, JAMES) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER ADMITTING STEPHEN A. DAUNOY AND SCOTT H. MORGAN PRO HAC VICE; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 4/15/2021. (sm) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

3 #4

Proposed Order

3 #3

Certification of Scott Morgan

3 #2

Certification of Stephen D'Aunoy

3 #1

Certification of James Coons

#3

(#3) Letter from James S. Coons to the Honorable Leda D. Wettre, U.S.M.J.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of James Coons, #2 Certification of Stephen D'Aunoy, #3 Certification of Scott Morgan, #4 Proposed Order)(COONS, JAMES) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

2 #1

Proposed Order

#2

(#2) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint. Attorney JAMES SIMON COONS for LESTER GLENN AUTO GROUP added. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(COONS, JAMES) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk`s Text Order - The document #11 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by LESTER GLENN AUTO GROUP has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 6/4/2021. (bt, ) (Entered: 05/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Plaintiffs' Amended Class Action Complaint. Attorney JAMES SIMON COONS for LESTER GLENN AUTO GROUP added. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(COONS, JAMES) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AMENDED COMPLAINT against ABC CORPORATIONS 1-10, CHRYSLER LLC, CHRYSLER PLYMOUTH OF PARAMUS INC., CHRYSLER SERVICE CONTRACTS, INC., DAIMLER CHRYSLER FINANCIAL SERVICES AMERICA LLC, DAIMLERCHRYSLER SERVICE CONTRACTS, INC., FCA HOLDCO B.V., FCA NORTH AMERICA HOLDINGS LLC, FCA US LLC, FIAT CHRYSLER AUTOMOBILES, NV, JOHN DOES 1-10, LESTER GLENN AUTO GROUP, MOPAR VEHICLE PROTECTION, STELLANTIS N.V., Old Carco Service Contracts, Inc., filed by THELMA PANNELL, FONTAINE DANTZLER.(GAINEY, BARRY) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by FONTAINE DANTZLER, THELMA PANNELL re #4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint (GAINEY, BARRY) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketPro Hac Vice counsel, STEPHEN A. D'AUNOY and SCOTT H. MORGAN, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (bt, ) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice SCOTT H. MORGAN to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12389399.) (COONS, JAMES) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice STEPHEN A. D'AUNOY to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 150 receipt number ANJDC-12389363.) (COONS, JAMES) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint. Motion set for 5/17/2021 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (bt, ) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by LESTER GLENN AUTO GROUP. (COONS, JAMES) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint by LESTER GLENN AUTO GROUP. Responses due by 5/3/2021 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law In Support, #2 Proposed Order)(COONS, JAMES) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER ADMITTING STEPHEN A. DAUNOY AND SCOTT H. MORGAN PRO HAC VICE; etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre on 4/15/2021. (sm) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Letter from James S. Coons to the Honorable Leda D. Wettre, U.S.M.J.. (Attachments: #1 Certification of James Coons, #2 Certification of Stephen D'Aunoy, #3 Certification of Scott Morgan, #4 Proposed Order)(COONS, JAMES) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk`s Text Order - The document #2 submitted by LESTER GLENN AUTO GROUP has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 4/16/2021. (sm) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Plaintiffs' Class Action Complaint. Attorney JAMES SIMON COONS for LESTER GLENN AUTO GROUP added. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(COONS, JAMES) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Madeline Cox Arleo and Magistrate Judge Leda D. Wettre. (jr) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by LESTER GLENN AUTO GROUP from Superior Court of Bergen County, case number BER-L-000652-21. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-12311334), filed by LESTER GLENN AUTO GROUP. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Certification of Service)(COONS, JAMES) (Entered: 03/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DAIMLER CHRYSLER CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where FCA NORTH AMERICA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where DAIMLERCHRYSLER CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Fiat Chrysler Automobiles N.V. is a litigant