This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/29/2021 at 18:09:18 (UTC).

Danny Choi v. Carmella Wallace et al

Case Summary

On 05/27/2021 Danny Choi filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Carmella Wallace. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Stephen V. Wilson and John E. McDermott. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-04447

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen V. Wilson

Referral Judge

John E. McDermott

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Danny Choi

Defendants

Interscope Records, Inc.

Dominique Mitchell

Universal Music Group Recordings, Inc.

Carmella Wallace

BMG Rights Management US, LLC

Mitch Talent Group, Inc.

Grade A Productions, LLC

Create Songs Publishing, Inc.

UMG Recordings, Inc.

BMG Rights Management US, LLC doing business as BMG Platinum Songs, US

Create Music Group, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brittney R Dobbins

Attorney at King and Ballow

1999 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 1100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Richard Steven Busch

Attorney at King and Ballow

1999 Avenue Of The Stars Suite 1100

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant Attorneys

Elizabeth L Schilken

Attorney at Ballard Spahr LLP

2029 Century Park East Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90067-2915

Robert S Gutierrez

Attorney at Ballard Spahr LLP

2029 Century Park East Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90067-2915

Max J. Sprecher

Attorney at Law Offices of Max J. Sprecher

5850 Canoga Avenue 4Th Floor

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

 

Court Documents

#28

#27

#26

#25

#24

#23

#22

#21

#20

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Interscope Records, Inc., Universal Music Group Recordings, Inc. (Gutierrez, Robert) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendants Interscope Records, Inc., Universal Music Group Recordings, Inc..(Attorney Robert S Gutierrez added to party Interscope Records, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Robert S Gutierrez added to party Universal Music Group Recordings, Inc.(pty:dft))(Gutierrez, Robert) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Certification and Notice of Interestede Parties filed by Defendants Grade A Productions, LLC, Carmella Wallace (Sprecher, Max) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Carmella Wallace.(Attorney Max J. Sprecher added to party Carmella Wallace (pty:dft))(Sprecher, Max) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Grade A Productions, LLC.(Attorney Max J. Sprecher added to party Grade A Productions, LLC(pty:dft))(Sprecher, Max) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Danny Choi, upon Defendant Create Songs Publishing, Inc. served on 7/12/2021, answer due 8/2/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Cate Hidalgo, Registered Agent Solutions, Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Dobbins, Brittney) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Danny Choi, upon Defendant Dominique Mitchell served on 7/8/2021, answer due 7/29/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Dominique Mitchell, professionally known as Mitch Mula in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Dobbins, Brittney) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Danny Choi, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Montijo, CT Corporation System, Inc., Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Dobbins, Brittney) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Danny Choi, upon Defendant Interscope Records, Inc. served on 7/7/2021, answer due 7/28/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Montijo, CT Corporation System, Inc., Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Dobbins, Brittney) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Danny Choi, upon Defendant Grade A Productions, LLC served on 7/7/2021, answer due 7/28/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Stacy Latson, eResident Agent Inc., Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Dobbins, Brittney) (Entered: 07/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Notice (Other) #8 by Judge Christina A. Snyder. The document is stricken and counsel is ordered to file an amended or corrected document by June 21, 2021. The Correct event to be used is: Civil Events Other Filings Miscellaneous Filings - select - Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121). (shb) (Entered: 06/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice (Other) #8 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Civil Events - select - Civil Events Other Filings Miscellaneous Filings - select - Report on Filing of Copyright Action (Initial Notification) (AO-121). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE filed by Plaintiff Danny Choi. REPORT ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION OR APPEAL REGARDING A COPYRIGHT (AO 121) (Dobbins, Brittney) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE filed by Plaintiff Danny Choi. Notice of Interested Parties (Dobbins, Brittney) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (esa) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (esa) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (esa) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Danny Choi. (Dobbins, Brittney) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31373150 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Danny Choi. (Attorney Brittney R Dobbins added to party Danny Choi(pty:pla))(Dobbins, Brittney) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where INTERSCOPE RECORDS A DIVISON OF UMG RECORDINGS INC AND TRAP ILLUSTRATED LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CREATE MUSIC GROUP, INC., a Delaware corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where GRADE A METALS CORP is a litigant

Latest cases where BMG Rights Management (UK) Limited is a litigant