This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/08/2021 at 08:45:33 (UTC).

Danna v. St Francis Medical Center

Case Summary

On 06/09/2021 Danna filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against St Francis Medical Center. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Terry A Doughty and Kayla D McClusky. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01574

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terry A Doughty

Referral Judge

Kayla D McClusky

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Anthony M Danna

Defendant

St Francis Medical Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James L Carroll

Attorney at Mixon Carroll & Frazier

P O Drawer 1619

Columbia, LA 71418

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil cover sheet

#2

#3

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Anthony M Danna. St Francis Medical Center waiver sent on 7/29/2021, answer due 9/27/2021. (aty,Carroll, James) Modified on 8/4/2021 to correct dates (Jones, P). (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to St Francis Medical Center. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketCASE Assigned to Judge Terry A Doughty and Magistrate Judge Kayla D McClusky. (crt,Miletello, A) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against St Francis Medical Center with Jury Demand (Filing fee $402, receipt number ALAWDC-4700307) filed by Anthony M Danna. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)(Attorney James L Carroll added to party Anthony M Danna(pty:pla))(aty,Carroll, James) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ST. FRANCIS MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James L Carroll