This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/07/2021 at 07:18:28 (UTC).

Danielson, et al v. Monsanto Company et al

Case Summary

On 07/09/2021 Danielson filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Monsanto Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Vince Chhabria. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-05301

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Vince Chhabria

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Thomas P. Danielson,

Nahid Ashtari

Tiffani Ballew

Brandford Strohmaier

Barbara Ann Kortes

Davidson Smith

Donna Marshall

Renee Nielsen

Rodney Catalano

Karen Hallett

Barbara Hagan

Lowell Stone

Michele Myers

Jonathan Myers

Lisa Fromme

Lee Marx

Steve Bidegain

Elizabeth Ann Kulinski-Vetting

Krystal Thorp

Joan Bennett

22 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gregory D. Rueb

Attorney at Dalimonte Rueb Stoller LLP

515 South Figueroa Street Suite 1550

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Behram Viraf Parekh

Attorney at Dalimonte Rueb Stoller LLP

515 S. Figueroa St., Suite 1550

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Gregory David Rueb

Attorney at Dalimonte Rueb Stoller LLP

515 S Figueroa St, Ste 1550, 515

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Other Attorneys

Tommy Huynh

Attorney at Arnold & Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

Three Embarcadero Center, 10Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Steven Robert Platt

Attorney at Parker, Milliken, Clark, O'Hara & Samuelian, P.C.

555 S. Flower Street, 30Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Ruta Paskevicius

Attorney at Goodman Neuman Hamilton LLP

One Post Street, Suite 2100

San Francisco, CA 94104

Joshua Seth Goodman

Attorney at Goodman Neuman Hamilton LLP

One Post Street, Suite 2100

San Francisco, CA 94104

Gabriela M. Vasquez

Attorney at Phillips, Spallas & Angstadt LLP

560 Mission Street, Suite 1010

San Francisco, CA 94105

Robert Kirk Phillips

Attorney at Phillips Spallas & Angstadt LLP

560 Mission Street, Suite 1010

San Francisco, CA 94105

Jennise Walker-Stubbs

Attorney at Shook Hardy & Bacon L.L.P.

600 Travis Street, Suite 3400

Houston, TX 77002-2926

 

Court Documents

#29

#28

27 #1

Proposed Order

#27

#26

#25

#24

#23

#22

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #7

Exhibit 7

1 #6

Exhibit 6

1 #5

Exhibit 5

1 #4

Exhibit 4

1 #3

Exhibit 3

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) CLERK'S NOTICE remanding case to San Francisco Superior Court. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2021) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketMDL MEMBER CASE CLOSED: MDL 2741, Pursuant to the Court's order of 8/25/21 in the MDL 3:16-md-02741-VC master file (dkt. #13445), civil case no. 3:21-cv-05301-VC is terminated. cc: JPMDL (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2021) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ORDER by Judge Vince Chhabria granting Stipulation: 13445 in case 3:16-md-02741-VC; (27) in case 3:21-cv-05301-VC. (vclc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2021) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Joint Stipulation To Remand Danielson Lawsuit To State Court filed by Monsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Huynh, Tommy) (Filed on 8/6/2021) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice of specified defendant by Lowell Stone, Judy Calcagno, Scott Ferguson (Rueb, Gregory) (Filed on 8/4/2021) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice of specified defendant by Joan Bennett, Thomas P. Danielson,, Davidson Smith, Brenda Evans, Nancy Jorgensen, Carol Clawson, Rachael Pessah-Sutherland (Rueb, Gregory) (Filed on 8/4/2021) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Meiners Oaks Hardware, Inc [Plaintiff Thomas Danielson, et al.] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 7/20/2021) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Certificate of Interested Entities by Meiners Oaks Hardware, Inc [Plaintiff Thomas Danielson, et al.] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 7/20/2021) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Meiner's Oaks Hardward, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) [Plaintiff Thomas Danielson, et al.] byMeiners Oaks Hardware, Inc. (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 7/20/2021) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Certificate of Interested Entities by Lowe's Companies, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Lowe's Home Centers, LLC for Lowe's Companies, Inc.. [Plaintiff Thomas Danielson, et al.] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 7/19/2021) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lowe's Companies, Inc. [Plaintiff Thomas Danielson, et al.] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 7/16/2021) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Certificate of Interested Entities by Lowe's Companies, Inc. [Plaintiff Thomas Danielson, et al.] (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 7/16/2021) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Lowe's Companies, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) [Plaintiff Thomas Danielson, et al.] byLowe's Companies, Inc.. (Walker-Stubbs, Jennise) (Filed on 7/16/2021) (Entered: 07/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketDIRECT FILE MEMBER CASE OPENED: MDL 2741, Danielson, et al v. Monsanto Company et al, Opened in California Northern District as 21-cv-05301-VC cc: JPMDL (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2021) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketCases associated: Create association to 3:16-md-02741-VC. (mclS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2021) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • Docket(#5) Case assigned to Judge Vince Chhabria. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. (anjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2021) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Monsanto Company re #3 Certificate of Interested Entities, #2 Certificate of Interested Entities, #1 Notice of Removal, (Huynh, Tommy) (Filed on 7/9/2021) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Monsanto Company identifying Corporate Parent Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Huynh, Tommy) (Filed on 7/9/2021) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Monsanto Company identifying Corporate Parent Bayer AG for Monsanto Company. (Huynh, Tommy) (Filed on 7/9/2021) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL of Danielson Case from California Superior Court - San Francisco. Their case number is CGC-21-591896. (Filing fee $402 receipt number 0971-16161507). Filed byMonsanto Company. (Attachments: #1 *copy of Complaint and Answers attached - Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Huynh, Tommy) (Filed on 7/9/2021) Modified on 7/12/2021 (mclS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennise Walker-Stubbs

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven Robert Platt

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua S. Goodman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ruta Valerie Paskevicius