This case was last updated from PACER on 11/11/2019 at 08:57:10 (UTC).

Daniels v. United Healthcare Services, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/12/2019 Daniels filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against United Healthcare Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Claire V Eagan and Frank H McCarthy. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00500

  • Filing Date:

    09/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Claire V Eagan

Referral Judge

Frank H McCarthy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wendall Daniels

Broken Arrow, OK 74011

Defendants

United Healthcare

United Healthcare Services, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Christopher A Barrow

Attorney at Barrow & Grimm PC

110 W 7Th St Ste 900

Tulsa, OK 74119-1044

Eric Scott Underwood

Attorney at Barrow & Grimm PC

110 W 7Th St Ste 900

Tulsa, OK 74119-1044

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) STIPULATION of Dismissal, closing case, by United Healthcare Services, Inc. (Underwood, Eric) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

#13

(#13) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by United Healthcare Services, Inc. (Underwood, Eric) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Party Name Correction by United Healthcare (Underwood, Eric) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

#9

(#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent UnitedHealth Group Incorporated for United Healthcare) by United Healthcare (Underwood, Eric) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

#8

(#8) STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by United Healthcare (Underwood, Eric) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

#7

(#7) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Christopher A Barrow on behalf of United Healthcare (Barrow, Christopher) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

#4

(#4) FILING FEES Paid in Full by United Healthcare (alg, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Eric Scott Underwood on behalf of United Healthcare (alg, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Removal from Tulsa Cty Dist Ct, case number SC-2019-10345 by United Healthcare (alg, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by United Healthcare (alg, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ***Civil Case Terminated (see document number #15 ) (sac, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) STIPULATION of Dismissal, closing case, by United Healthcare Services, Inc. (Underwood, Eric) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan that defendant's unoppoded motion #13 is granted; answer or fully-executed joint stipulation of dismissal due 10/18/19. ; setting/resetting deadline(s)/hearing(s): ( Miscellaneous Deadline set for 10/18/2019); granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer (Re: State Court Petition/Complaint ) by United Healthcare Services, Inc. (Underwood, Eric) (Entered: 09/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing the party name for United HealthCare be corrected as indicated in the Notice of Party Name Correction. If any other party to this case objects to this Party Name Correction, they shall file a Motion to Reconsider Party Name Correction within seven (7) days of this order. (Re: #11 Notice of Party Name Correction ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (sc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Party Name Correction by United Healthcare (Underwood, Eric) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MINUTE ORDER by Judge Claire V Eagan - Directing defendant to file forthwith a separate Notice of Party Name Correction reflecting its true and correct corporate identity. (Re: #8 Status Report on Removed Action, #9 Disclosure Statement (Corporate), #2 Notice of Removal ) (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (RGG, Chambers) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent UnitedHealth Group Incorporated for United Healthcare) by United Healthcare (Underwood, Eric) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STATUS REPORT on Removed Action by United Healthcare (Underwood, Eric) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Christopher A Barrow on behalf of United Healthcare (Barrow, Christopher) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • (#6) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , directing United Healthcare to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to FRCvP 7.1 within seven (7) days of this order, if they have not already done so. The parties shall use the form entitled Corporate Disclosure Statement available on the Courts website (please do not refile if already filed on non-court form unless directed to do so). If you have already filed your Corporate Disclosure Statement in this case, you are reminded to file a Supplemental Corporate Disclosure Statement within a reasonable time of any change in the information that the statement requires. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (alg, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • (#5) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk , : Pursuant to Local Rule 81.2, the removing party(ies) shall file a Status Report on Removed Action within five (5) days of the filing of the notice of removal in the U.S. District Court. The form is available on the Court's website. (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (alg, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) FILING FEES Paid in Full by United Healthcare (alg, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Eric Scott Underwood on behalf of United Healthcare (alg, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Removal from Tulsa Cty Dist Ct, case number SC-2019-10345 by United Healthcare (alg, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by United Healthcare (alg, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT filed in State Court against United Healthcare by Wendall Daniels (alg, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less